EP1727354 - Page edge correction systems and methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.10.2017 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 20A, 100 Clinton Avenue South Rochester New York 14644 / US | [2006/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
McElvain, Jon S. 1639 9th Street Manhattan Beach, CA 90266 / US | [2006/48] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/49] |
Former [2006/48] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06114418.4 | 23.05.2006 | [2006/48] | Priority number, date | US20050135742 | 24.05.2005 Original published format: US 135742 | [2006/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1727354 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1727354 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | [2007/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1727354 | Date: | 07.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/58 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
H04N1/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2016/49] |
Former [2008/21] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2006/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Geräte und Verfahren zur Korrektur von Seitenkanten | [2006/48] | English: | Page edge correction systems and methods | [2006/48] | French: | Appareils et méthodes pour corriger les bords d'une page | [2006/48] | Examination procedure | 12.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/17] | 13.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 18.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 25.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.04.2008 | Opposition(s) | 08.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 01.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1091565 (CREOSCITEX CORP LTD [IL]) [X] 1-5,8,9 * abstract * * figures 4-9 * * paragraphs [0056] - [0066] * [Y] 6,7,10; | [Y]US5877787 (EDGE CHRISTOPHER J [US]) [Y] 6,7,10 * abstract * * column 6, line 44 - column 9, line 41 * * figure 1 *; | [A]US2004201865 (MCELVAIN JON S [US]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [DA]US2001033686 (KLASSEN R VICTOR [US]) [DA] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0075] - [0086]; figure 2 * | Examination | US2004114162 |