EP1705309 - Flooring and floorboard [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.03.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.04.2010 [2010/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Välinge Innovation AB Apelvägen 2 260 40 Viken / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/39] | For all designated states Välinge Innovation AB Apelvägen 2 260 40 Viken / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pervan, Darko Kyrkogränden 1 260 40, Viken / SE | [2006/39] | Representative(s) | Akesson, Sten Jan-Ake, et al Awapatent AB Box 1066 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/28] | Akesson, Sten Jan-Ake, et al Awapatent AB Box 1066 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | ||
Former [2006/39] | Bokinge, Ole, et al Awapatent AB Platensgatan 9 C 582 20 Linköping / SE | Application number, filing date | 06115830.9 | 22.04.2003 | [2006/39] | Priority number, date | SE20020001225 | 22.04.2002 Original published format: SE 0201225 | SE20020003482 | 21.11.2002 Original published format: SE 0203482 | [2006/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1705309 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1705309 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E04F15/02, B27M3/04 | [2009/13] | CPC: |
E04F15/02 (EP,KR);
E04F15/04 (KR);
B44C5/043 (EP);
B44F3/00 (EP);
E04F15/02033 (EP);
E04F21/22 (EP);
E04F2201/0107 (EP);
E04F2201/0115 (EP);
E04F2201/0153 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2006/39] | E04F15/02 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/39] | Title | German: | Fussboden und Bodenplatte | [2006/39] | English: | Flooring and floorboard | [2006/39] | French: | Plancher et panneau de plancher | [2006/39] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2006 | Examination requested [2006/39] | 26.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/14] | 03.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/14] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03721225.5 / EP1497510 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3343601 (BUETEC GES FUER BUEHNENTECHNIS [DE]) [A] 1,10 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH07300979 (DAIKEN TRADE & INDUSTRY) [A] 1,10* the whole document *; | [PX]WO03025307 (VALINGE ALUMINIUM AB [SE], et al) [PX] 1-10 * page 13, line 31 - line 36 * * figures 12,13 * * page 1 - page 2 * * page 24, line 30 - page 25, line 16 * |