EP1755368 - Cooling system and method for cooling electronic devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 04.11.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.11.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 07.12.2011 [2011/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states B.V. Twentsche Kabelfabriek Spinnerstraat 15 7481 KJ Haaksbergen / NL | [2010/01] |
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states Isolectra B.V. Rivium Boulevard 101 2909 LK Capelle aan den Ijssel / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Klamer, Jan Merelhoven 88 2902 KL, Capelle aan den Ijssel / NL | [2007/08] | Representative(s) | Brouwer, Hendrik Rogier, et al Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/08] | Brouwer, Hendrik Rogier, et al Patentwerk B.V. P.O. Box 1514 5200 BN 's-Hertogenbosch / NL | Application number, filing date | 06119054.2 | 17.08.2006 | [2007/08] | Priority number, date | NL20051029750 | 17.08.2005 Original published format: NL 1029750 | [2007/08] | Filing language | NL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1755368 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/08] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1755368 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | [2007/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/20 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
H05K7/20609 (EP);
F28D15/00 (EP);
F28D20/0052 (EP);
Y02E60/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/08] | Title | German: | Kühlanordnung und Verfahren zum Kühlen von elektronischen Vorrichtungen | [2007/08] | English: | Cooling system and method for cooling electronic devices | [2007/08] | French: | Système de refroidissement et methode pour refroidir des dispositifs électroniques | [2007/08] | Examination procedure | 10.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/22] | 27.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/49] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.05.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE29901658U (BURN HEINZ [CH]) [A] 1-17* claims 1-13 *; | [X]US6538883 (GREER STEPHEN [US]) [X] 1,4-7,9,10,12,13,15-17 * column 2, line 63 - column 3, line 67; figures 2,3; claims 1-38 *; | [A]US2004100770 (CHU RICHARD C [US], et al) [A] 1,14-17 * paragraph [0038]; claims 1-20 *; | [A]EP1489895 (SHINDENGEN ELECTRIC MFG [JP]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | by applicant | WO9505570 |