EP1772575 - Base of sunshade umbrella [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/15] | Base of Sunshade Umbrella | ||
[2012/35] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.08.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nengsen, Chen No. 811, Dong Fang Road Linhai, Zhejiang Province / CN | [2007/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/15] | Representative(s) | Luys, Marie-José A.H., et al Gevers Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | [2010/40] |
Former [2007/15] | Gevers, François, et al Gevers & Vander Haeghen Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | Application number, filing date | 06121461.5 | 28.09.2006 | [2007/15] | Priority number, date | CN2005215353U | 08.10.2005 Original published format: CN 200520015353 U | [2007/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1772575 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1772575 | Date: | 22.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E04H12/22, E04H15/28, B60B33/00, // A45B23/00 | [2012/34] | CPC: |
E04H12/2246 (EP,US);
E04H15/28 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/15] | E04H12/22 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2013/18] |
Former [2007/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Sonnenschirmfuss | [2007/15] | English: | Base of sunshade umbrella | [2012/35] | French: | Base pour parasol | [2007/15] |
Former [2007/15] | Base of Sunshade Umbrella | Examination procedure | 23.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/37] | 16.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2013/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US6367494 (TUNG BENSON [TW]) [X] 1,2,4 * figure 6 *[I] 3,5 |