EP1775807 - Optical semiconductor apparatus with locked charge carrier density [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.10.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.11.2010 [2010/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54, rue la Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states Alcatel Lucent 54 rue La Boétie 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dagens, Béatrice 20 rue Fondouze 92160 Antony / FR | [2007/16] | Representative(s) | Bréda, Jean-Marc, et al Marks & Clerk France Conseils en Propriété Industrielle Immeuble " Visium " 22 Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | Bréda, Jean-Marc, et al Marks & Clerk France 31-33, Avenue Aristide Briand 94117 Arcueil Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 06121844.2 | 05.10.2006 | [2007/16] | Priority number, date | FR20050010512 | 14.10.2005 Original published format: FR 0510512 | [2007/16] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1775807 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1775807 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | [2007/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01S5/50, H01S5/34, H01S5/12 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
H01S5/50 (EP,US);
B82Y20/00 (EP,US);
H01S5/12 (EP,US);
H01S5/341 (EP,US);
H01S5/5072 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/16] | Title | German: | Optische Halbleiter-Vorrichtung mit gesperrter Ladungsträgerdichte | [2007/16] | English: | Optical semiconductor apparatus with locked charge carrier density | [2007/16] | French: | Dispositif optique à semiconducteur à densité de porteurs verrouillée | [2007/16] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 05.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/45] | 22.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0639876 (ALCATEL NV [NL]) [Y] 1-4* abstract *; | [Y]US2003090779 (LEE DONGHAN [KR]) [Y] 1-4 * claim 3 * * paragraph [0013] *; | [Y]EP1460742 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * claim 1 * * figure 4 * * saturation of ground energy transition state with J>J1 *; | [Y]US2005122571 (KIM HO-IN [KR], et al) [Y] 1-4 * the whole document *; | [X] - MARKUS A ET AL, "Impact of intraband relaxation on the performance of a quantum-dot laser", IEEE JOURNAL OF SELECTED TOPICS IN QUANTUM ELECTRONICS IEEE USA, (200309), vol. 9, no. 5, ISSN 1077-260X, pages 1308 - 1314, XP002384466 [X] 1-4 * abstract * * pages 1308-131 * * Parties II et III * * figure 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JSTQE.2003.819494 | [Y] - BERG T W ET AL, "SATURATION AND NOISE PROPERTIES OF QUANTUM-DOT OPTICAL AMPLIFIERS", IEEE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (200411), vol. 40, no. 11, ISSN 0018-9197, pages 1527 - 1539, XP001214184 [Y] 1-4 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JQE.2004.835114 |