|
07.01.2019 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2019 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2018 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2018 |
Clean copy of claims in the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2018 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.09.2018 |
Communication concerning surcharge and failure to observe time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.08.2018 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.08.2018 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.08.2018 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2018 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.08.2018 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2018 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2018 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
4 |
|
06.06.2018 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
01.06.2018 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2018 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.02.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.02.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2018 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.02.2018 |
OPPODREX with handwritten amendments |
Opposition |
15 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.10.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.09.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.09.2017 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2017 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.09.2017 |
Description |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.09.2017 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.08.2017 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.06.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
12.06.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.04.2017 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.03.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.03.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
23.02.2017 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.02.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2017 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
17.02.2017 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
09.02.2017 |
F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.02.2017 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.10.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.08.2016 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.08.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.08.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.08.2016 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2014 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
04.07.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
03.07.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
26.03.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2014 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.03.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2014 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.03.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.02.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2014 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.01.2014 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2014 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.01.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.01.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2014 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
16.12.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.12.2013 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.12.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.12.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.11.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.10.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
08.10.2013 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
30 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.09.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.08.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.08.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2012 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
22.08.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2012 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2012 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.06.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.05.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.05.2012 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
31.05.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.05.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.05.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.04.2012 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.04.2012 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.04.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2012 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
11.04.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.04.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.04.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.03.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.03.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.03.2012 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.03.2012 |
Request for change of name -opponent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.03.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.03.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2012 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.02.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.02.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.2012 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.02.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.01.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
30.12.2011 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
30.12.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.12.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.09.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.09.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.09.2011 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.09.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.09.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.09.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.05.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.05.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.04.2011 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
10.06.2010 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.05.2010 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2009 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.12.2009 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.12.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
07.05.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2009 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.05.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.06.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.04.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2007 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2007 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2007 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.02.2007 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2007 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.02.2007 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.10.2006 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.10.2006 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |