EP1814270 - Apparatus and method for connecting call in mobile terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.01.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-743 / KR | [2009/10] |
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong, Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Noh-Sun No. 214-1703, Korea APT, Hwanggol Village Yeongtong-dong Paldal-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Moon, Yong-Suk No. 125-106, Samik APT, Parktown, Sunae-dong Bundang-gu, Seongnam-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Kim, Yu-Shin No. Da-103, Geumseong villa, Cheonghak-dong 72-4 Osan-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2007/31] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/21] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/31] | Zimmer, Franz-Josef Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06124826.6 | 27.11.2006 | [2007/31] | Priority number, date | KR20060008384 | 26.01.2006 Original published format: KR 20060008384 | [2007/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1814270 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1814270 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/56 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
H04W76/18 (EP,US);
H04M1/21 (KR);
H04M1/0214 (KR);
H04M1/0235 (KR);
H04M1/0266 (KR);
H04M1/0274 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/15] |
Former [2007/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Anrufverbindung in einem mobilen Endgerät | [2007/31] | English: | Apparatus and method for connecting call in mobile terminal | [2007/31] | French: | Appareil et procédé de connexion d' appel dans un terminal mobile | [2007/31] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/31] | 20.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 07.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YX]US2005090224 (DORSEY DONALD A [US], et al) [Y] 1-7 * paragraphs [0002] - [0028]; figure 3 * [X] 8-13; | [X]EP1509056 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 8-13 * paragraph [0037] * * page 7; table 1 * * page 9; table 3 * * paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0133] *; | [X]WO0154442 (NOKIA NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [X] 8,13 * paragraph [ABSTRACT] * * pages 1-11 *; | [A]US2004264421 (SATO HIROFUMI [JP], et al) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0050]; figure 9 *; | [Y] - TEKTRONIX, "Exploit KPI measurements for UTRAN optimization", (2005), pages 1 - 12, URL: www.tek.com/measurement/app_notes/2FW_18608, (20070516), XP002434100 [Y] 1-7 * page 7, column R - page 8, column L * | [A] - 3GPP2, "Direct spread specification for spread spectrum systems on ANSI-41 (DS-41), (Upper Layers Air Interface)", C.S0007-0, (20000609), page 1-10, URL: www.3gpp2.org/public_html/specs/CS0007-0.pd, (20070516), XP002434101 [A] 1-13 * paragraph [1.5.4] * | by applicant | US2005090224 |