EP1683610 - Paper cutter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.12.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.01.2009 [2009/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CARL MANUFACTURING CO., LTD. 3-7-9, Tateishi, Katsushika-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Suzuki, Hideyuki c/o Carl Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 3-7-9 Tateishi, Katsushika-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Kato, Masayuki c/o Carl Manufacturing Co., Ltd. 3-7-9 Tateishi, Katsushika-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/30] | Representative(s) | Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/30] | Luckhurst, Anthony Henry William Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06250300.8 | 20.01.2006 | [2006/30] | Priority number, date | JP20050014141 | 21.01.2005 Original published format: JP 2005014141 | [2006/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1683610 | Date: | 26.07.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B26D1/20 | [2006/30] | CPC: |
B26D1/205 (EP,US);
B26D7/015 (EP,US);
B26D7/025 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7734 (EP,US);
Y10T83/7763 (EP,US);
Y10T83/8822 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/15] |
Former [2006/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Papierschneider | [2006/30] | English: | Paper cutter | [2006/30] | French: | Coupe-papier | [2006/30] | Examination procedure | 06.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/30] | 27.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/05] | 08.09.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/05] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YDA]JPH05245794 ; | [YA]GB1141951 (DOHERTY SONS LTD EDWARD) [Y] 1-3,5,6,9,10 * page 2, lines 5-10 - lines 39-45; figures 1,2 * [A] 4,7,8,10; | [YA]FR2262578 (GIRARD ROGER [FR]) [Y] 1 * figures 1-3 * [A] 2-11; | [A]US5613415 (SANPEI TAKAAKI [JP]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [YA]EP0813935 (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-3,5,6,9,10 * figures 3,6 * [A] 4,7,8,10; | [A]EP1493540 (SCHWELLING HERMANN [DE]) [A] 1-11* figure 1a * | [YDA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19931222), vol. 017, no. 705, Database accession no. (M - 1534), & JP05245794 A 19930924 (KARL JIMUKI KK) [YD] 1 * abstract * [A] 2-11 |