EP1705231 - Non-chromate aqueous metal surface treating composition, surface-treated steel, painted steel, steel surface treatment method, and painted steel preparing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 19.11.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.11.2010 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 22.12.2010 [2010/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 6-1, Ohtemachi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [2006/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Matsumura, K. Silicone-Elec. Materials Res. Cntr Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-10, Oaza Hitomi Matsuida-machi Usui-gun Gunma-ken / JP | 02 /
Asai, Mitsuo Silicone-Elec. Materials Res. Cnti Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-10, Oaza Hitomi Matsuida-machi Usui-gun Gunma-ken / JP | [2008/26] |
Former [2006/39] | 01 /
Matsumura, K. Silicone-Elec. Materials Res. Cntr Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-10, Oaza Hitomi Matsuida-machi Usui-gun Gunma-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Asai, Matsuo Silicone-Elec. Materials Res. Cntr Shin-Etsu Chemical Co., Ltd. 1-10, Oaza Hitomi Matsuida-machi Usui-gun Gunma-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Oxley, Rachel Louise, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/36] | Oxley, Rachel Louise, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
Former [2008/27] | Oxley, Rachel Louise, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [2006/39] | Oxley, Rachel Louise, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 06251557.2 | 23.03.2006 | [2006/39] | Priority number, date | JP20050083759 | 23.03.2005 Original published format: JP 2005083759 | [2006/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1705231 | Date: | 27.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1705231 | Date: | 02.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/27] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1705231 | Date: | 22.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.07.2006 | Classification | IPC: | C09D183/14, C09D5/08 | [2006/39] | CPC: |
C09D183/14 (EP,US);
C09D5/08 (EP,US);
C23C22/74 (EP,US);
C23C2222/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/22] |
Former [2006/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Chromfreie Zusammensetzung zur Behandlung von Metalloberflächen, oberflächenbehandelter Stahl, lackierter Stahl, Methode zur Behandlung von Stahloberflächen und lackiertem Stahl | [2008/10] | English: | Non-chromate aqueous metal surface treating composition, surface-treated steel, painted steel, steel surface treatment method, and painted steel preparing method | [2006/39] | French: | Compositions aqueuse sans chromate pour le traitement de surfaces métalliques; Surface en acier traitée; Méthode de traitement d'une surface en acier et méthode de préparation d'un acier laqué | [2006/39] |
Former [2006/39] | Chromfreie Zusammensetzung zur Behandlung von Metalloberflächen, oberflächenbehandelter Stahl, bemalter Stahl, Methode zur Behandlung von Stahloberflächen und bemaltem Stahl | Examination procedure | 22.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 26.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.05.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.05.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.05.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
07.02.2009
18.02.2009
ADMISSIBLE Evonik Degussa GmbH Paul-Baumann-Strasse 1 45764 Marl / DE Opponent's representative Bendele, Tanja RUHR-IP Patentanwälte Brucker Holt 58 45133 Essen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.02.2009
18.02.2009
ADMISSIBLE Evonik Degussa GmbH Paul-Baumann-Strasse 1 45764 Marl / DE Opponent's representative Bendele, Tanja RUHR-IP Postfach 23 01 44 45069 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2009/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
07.02.2009
Evonik Degussa GmbH Paul-Baumann-Strasse 1 45764 Marl / DE | 08.05.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 16.09.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 17.03.2010 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.03.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 22.04.2010 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 22.04.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 08.11.2010 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6261638 (VAN OOIJ WIM J [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 8, line 19; claims 1,4,13,21 *; | [X]US6596835 (BROWN KEVIN [GB], et al) [X] 1-8 * column 5, line 57 - column 6, line 66; examples 1-9; claims 1-4 *; | [A]US2004028829 (VAN OOIJ WIM J [US], et al) [A] 1-8* claims 1-3 * |