|
13.06.2018 |
Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2016 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.09.2016 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
12.09.2016 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2016 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.08.2016 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.08.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
04.07.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.06.2016 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
13.06.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.06.2016 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.04.2015 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.01.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.12.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2011 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.05.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.04.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
12.04.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.04.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
6 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.04.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.02.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2011 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.02.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.02.2011 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2010 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.11.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2010 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2010 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2010 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.11.2010 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.11.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2010 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2010 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.10.2010 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.10.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
27.09.2010 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.09.2010 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.09.2010 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.09.2010 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
26.04.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.04.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2010 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.09.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.09.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.09.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.09.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.09.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2009 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.03.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.03.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.03.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.03.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.03.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.12.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2008 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.11.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2008 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2008 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2008 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2008 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2008 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2008 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2008 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.03.2008 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2006 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.04.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2006 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.04.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
18.04.2006 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.04.2006 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.04.2006 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
18.04.2006 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |