EP1770388 - Fiber optic sensing device and method of making and operating the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady NY 12345 / US | ||
Former [2007/14] | For all designated states General Electric Company One River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Xia, Hua 129 Halfmoon Drive Altamont, New York 12009 / US | 02 /
Deng, Kung Li 40 Towpath Lane Waterford, New York 12188 / US | 03 /
Guida, Renato 620 Church Street Wynantskill, New York 12198 / US | [2007/14] | Representative(s) | Bedford, Grant Richard, et al GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | Bedford, Grant Richard, et al GE London Patent Operation 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | ||
Former [2007/14] | Bedford, Grant Richard, et al London Patent Operation GE International Inc 15 John Adam Street London WC2N 6LU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06255020.7 | 28.09.2006 | [2007/14] | Priority number, date | US20050240057 | 30.09.2005 Original published format: US 240057 | [2007/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1770388 | Date: | 04.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/77, G02B6/02 | [2007/14] | CPC: |
G02B6/02085 (EP,US);
G01N21/7703 (EP,US);
G01N21/774 (EP,US);
G01N2021/7706 (EP,US);
G01N21/39 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI [2007/50] |
Former [2007/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Faseroptische Sensorvorrichtung und Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und Betrieb | [2007/14] | English: | Fiber optic sensing device and method of making and operating the same | [2007/14] | French: | Dispositif de détection à fibre optique et son procédé de fonctionnement et de fabrication | [2007/14] | Examination procedure | 04.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 06.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.02.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/36] | 28.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.11.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.09.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2016 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5168156 (FISCHER GEORGE [US], et al); | [XY]WO0106279 (UNIV SYDNEY [AU], et al); | [XY]US2005163424 (CHEN PENG [US]); | [XY]US6950578 (RAMACHANDRAN SIDDHARTH [US]) | Examination | GB2395797 | by applicant | WO0106279 | US2005163424 | US6950578 |