EP1790429 - Imaging methods [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - representative | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Electronic Materials, LLC 455 Forest Street Marlborough Massachusetts 01752 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/22] | For all designated states Rohm and Haas Electronic Materials, L.L.C. 455 Forest Street Marlborough Massachusetts 01752 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barr, Robert K. 40 Olde Colony Drive Shrewsbury, Massachusetts 01545 / US | 02 /
O'Connor, Corey 604 Plantation Street Worcester, Massachusetts 01605 / US | [2007/22] | Representative(s) | Kent, Venetia Katherine, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | Kent, Venetia Katherine, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE 45 1DZ / GB | ||
Former [2007/22] | Kent, Venetia Katherine, et al Rohm and Haas (UK) Ltd. European Patent Department 4th Floor, 22 Tudor Street London EC4Y 0AY / GB | Application number, filing date | 06255979.4 | 22.11.2006 | [2007/22] | Priority number, date | US20050287102 | 23.11.2005 Original published format: US 287102 | [2007/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1790429 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B23P19/04, B23K26/18, B23Q17/24, G03C5/08, G03C1/73, G03C1/77 | [2007/22] | CPC: |
G03C5/08 (EP,US);
G03C1/73 (EP,US);
G03C1/77 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB [2008/06] |
Former [2007/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bildgebungsverfahren | [2007/22] | English: | Imaging methods | [2007/22] | French: | Procédés d'imagerie | [2007/22] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 25.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/49] | 14.07.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2009/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2008 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005175931 (BARR ROBERT K [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0013] , [0020] , [0027] , [0028] , [0036] , [0039] , [0040] , [0095] , [0099] , [0114] , [0119] , [0121]; claims 1,8-10 *; | [X]US2005175229 (BARR ROBERT K [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * paragraphs [0016] , [0028] - [0030] - [0136] - [0145] - [0178]; tables 2,3,5 *; | [A]WO2005027039 (LASER PROJECTION TECHNOLOGIES [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 18 - page 3, line 3 * * page 4, line 30 - page 5, line 23 * * page 8, line 25 - line 33 * * page 15, line 21 - page 16, line 12; claim 1 *; | [A]US6828525 (HAYES MICHAEL W [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 20 - column 3, line 43 * * column 4, line 41 - line 47; claims 1-49 *; | [A]US6576391 (IGUCHI YUICHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * claim 1 *; | [A]US2002016541 (GLOSSOP NEIL DAVID [CA]) [A] 2 * claims 8,9 * | [A] - "Laser-Imageable Technologies", INTERNET CITATION, (2003), URL: http://electronicmaterials.rohmhaas.com/businesses/cbt/registar/defau lt.asp?caid=465, (20050622), XP002333083 [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2005175931 | US2005175229 |