EP1793510 - Communication node, wireless communication system and data relay method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/23] | Communication node, wireless communication system and data relay method | ||
[2014/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.09.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/44] | For all designated states NTT DOCOMO, INC. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
Former [2007/23] | For all designated states NTT DoCoMo, Inc. 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shi, Hui c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 02 /
Asai, Takahiro c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | 03 /
Yoshino, Hitoshi c/o Intellectual Property Department NTT DoCoMo Inc Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | [2014/25] |
Former [2013/07] | 01 /
Shi, Hui, IP Dept., NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
02 /
Asai, Takahiro IP Dept., NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
03 /
Yoshino, Hitoshi IP Dept., NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 10-6150 / JP | |||
Former [2007/23] | 01 /
Shi, Hui, IP Dept., NTT DoCoMo, Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1 Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | ||
02 /
Asai, Takahiro IP Dept., NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-6150 / JP | |||
03 /
Yoshino, Hitoschi IP Dept., NTT DoCoMo Inc. Sanno Park Tower 11-1, Nagatacho 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 10-6150 / JP | Representative(s) | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [2014/45] |
Former [2007/23] | Maury, Richard Philip Marks & Clerk 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06256094.1 | 29.11.2006 | [2014/45] | Priority number, date | JP20050349727 | 02.12.2005 Original published format: JP 2005349727 | JP20060069777 | 14.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006069777 | [2007/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1793510 | Date: | 06.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1793510 | Date: | 27.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1793510 | Date: | 05.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04B7/155 | [2007/23] | CPC: |
H04B7/15585 (EP,US);
H04B7/2606 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2013/10] |
Former [2007/23] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kommunikationsknoten, drahtloses Kommunikationssystem und Datenweiterleitungsverfahren | [2014/45] | English: | Communication node, wireless communication system and data relay method | [2014/45] | French: | Noeud de communication, système de communications sans fil et procédé de relais de données | [2014/45] |
Former [2007/23] | Kommunikationsknoten, drahtloses Kommunikationssystem und Datenweiterleitungsverfahren | ||
Former [2007/23] | Communication node, wireless communication system and data relay method | ||
Former [2007/23] | Noeud de communication, système de communications sans fil et procédé de relais de données | Examination procedure | 05.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/23] | 24.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.12.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 31.01.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP12199672.2 / EP2575268 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.05.2013 | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP1538762 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [X] 1,3-8,10 * paragraphs [0026] - [0034] - [0054] , [0065] - [0075]; figures 6-7,12,14,16-18; claims 1-2 * [I] 11-13; | [XP]EP1638236 (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [XP] 1,2,5-10* abstract *; | [X] - RANKOV B ET AL, "Spectral Efficient Signaling for Half-duplex Relay Channels", SIGNALS, SYSTEMS AND COMPUTERS, 2005. CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE THIRTY- NINTH ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON, PACIFIC GROVE, CALIFORNIA OCTOBER 28 - NOVEMBER 1, IEEE, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20051028), doi:10.1109/ACSSC.2005.1599922, ISBN 978-1-4244-0131-4, pages 1066 - 1071, XP010900172 [X] 1,5,7,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [000I] - [00II] - [00IV] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ACSSC.2005.1599922 | [X] - OECHTERING T J ET AL, "A new cooperative transmission scheme using the space-time delay code", SMART ANTENNAS, 2004. ITG WORKSHOP ON MUNICH, GERMANY MARCH 18-19, 2004, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20040318), doi:10.1109/WSA.2004.1407646, ISBN 978-0-7803-8327-2, pages 41 - 48, XP010780077 [X] 1,5,7,8 * abstract * * paragraphs [00II] , [000B] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WSA.2004.1407646 | Examination | US7826337 | by applicant | EP1538762 | EP1638236 | - ROHIT U.NABAR, "Capacity Scaling Laws in MIMO Wireless networks", ALLERTON CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATION, CONTROL, AND COMPUTING, (200310), pages 378 - 389 | - HUI SHI ET AL., "A Relaying Scheme using QR Decomposion with Phase Control for MIMO Wireless Networks", IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS, (20050516), vol. 4, doi:doi:10.1109/ICC.2005.1494840, pages 2705 - 2711, XP010825677 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICC.2005.1494840 | - G.D.GOLDEN; G.J.FOSCHINI; R.A.VALENZUELA; P.W.WOLNIANSKY, "Detection Algorithm and Initial Laboratory Results using the V-Blast Space-Time Communication Architecture", ELECTRONIC LETTERS, (19990107), vol. 35, no. 1, doi:doi:10.1049/el:19990058, XP006011643 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19990058 | - RANKOV B ET AL., CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE THIRTY-NINTH ASILOMAR CONFERENCE ON SIGNALS, SYSTEMS AND COMPUTERS, (20051028), pages 1066 - 1071 | - OECHTERING T. J. ET AL., "ITG Workshop on Smart Antennas", IEEE, (20040318), pages 41 - 48 |