EP1804122 - Lithographic apparatus and device manufacturing method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.01.2013 [2013/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2007/27] | For all designated states ASML Netherlands B.V. De Run 6501 5504 DR Veldhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zaal, Koen Jacobus Johannes Maria St Catharinastraat 53 5611 JB Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
Ottens, Joost Jeroen Dotterbeek 37 5501 BG Veldhoven / NL | [2007/27] | Representative(s) | Corcoran, Gregory Martin Mason, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property De Run 6501 P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2009/23] | Corcoran, Gregory Martin Mason, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2009/09] | Van den Hooven, Jan, et al ASML Netherlands B.V. Corporate Intellectual Property P.O. Box 324 5500 AH Veldhoven / NL | ||
Former [2007/27] | Leeming, John Gerard J.A. Kemp & Co., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06256380.4 | 15.12.2006 | [2007/27] | Priority number, date | US20050321461 | 30.12.2005 Original published format: US 321461 | [2007/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1804122 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1804122 | Date: | 07.11.2007 | [2007/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1804122 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
G03F7/70725 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70875 (KR,US);
G03F7/70716 (US);
G03F7/2041 (KR);
G03F7/70341 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70775 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70783 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/7085 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/70858 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2008/29] |
Former [2007/27] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Lithographische Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Vorrichtung | [2007/27] | English: | Lithographic apparatus and device manufacturing method | [2007/27] | French: | Appareil lithographique et procédé de fabrication d'un dispositif | [2007/27] | Examination procedure | 24.04.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 08.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP10180995.2 / EP2261743 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 01.02.2012 | NL | 01.02.2012 | [2012/50] |
Former [2012/35] | NL | 01.02.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5363196 (CAMERON JOHN F [US]) [X] 25-27 * column 3 - column 6; figures 1,2 *; | [X]JPH10260009 (NIKON CORP) [X] 25-27 * abstract *; | [X]US2002137358 (BINNARD MIKE [US], et al) [X] 18,24 * paragraph [0110] *; | [X]EP1420299 (ASML NETHERLANDS BV [NL]) [X] 14,17 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0040]; figures 3-5 *; | [X]WO2004053425 (ZYGO CORP [US], et al) [X] 25-27 * page 8, line 11 - page 11, line 14; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2005046813 (STREEFKERK BOB [NL], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0062] *; | [X]JP2005317600 (NIKON CORP) [X] 18,24 * abstract *; | [A]WO2005122219 (NIKON CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * abstract *; | [E]WO2007049603 (NIKON CORP [JP], et al) [E] 18-22,24-27 * abstract *; | [E]US2007109522 (EBIHARA AKIMITSU [JP], et al) [E] 18-22,24-27 * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0013]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0049]; figure 3 * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0093]; figures 5-9 ** paragraph [0109] *; | [E]EP1788617 (NIKON CORP [JP]) [E] 1-17 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0018]; figure 1 * |