|
23.02.2017 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.02.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
22 |
|
17.02.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.10.2016 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.10.2016 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.09.2016 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.09.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.09.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.09.2016 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.08.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.08.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.08.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2016 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.07.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.07.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.07.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.07.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.07.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.07.2016 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
7 |
|
01.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2016 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
14 |
|
18.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.06.2016 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.06.2016 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2016 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.06.2016 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
07.06.2016 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.09.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.08.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
16 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
10 |
|
30.07.2013 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.07.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.04.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.04.2013 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2013 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Withdrawal of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
32 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
30 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
25.03.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
37 |
|
04.02.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
04.02.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
25.01.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
23.01.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.01.2013 |
Document concerning appeal fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.01.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2012 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.12.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.12.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.12.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.12.2011 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.11.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2011 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.10.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.10.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2011 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
19.10.2011 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.10.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.10.2010 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
9 |
|
26.10.2010 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2010 |
Description |
Opposition |
11 |
|
26.10.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
13.07.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.07.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.07.2010 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
18.05.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
18.05.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
14.05.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
14.05.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
32 |
|
14.05.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
14.05.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
14.05.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
11.05.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
02.02.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2009 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2009 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
28.11.2008 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2008 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2008 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
04.11.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
08.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.07.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.06.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2008 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.03.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.02.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2007 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.08.2007 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2007 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2007 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.02.2007 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2007 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2007 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.01.2007 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2007 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.01.2007 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2006 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |