EP1929951 - Acoustic system and method for evaluation skin texture [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Consumer France SAS 1, rue Camille Desmoulins 92787 Issy les Moulineaux Cedex 9 / FR | [2008/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bruère, Valérie 1 rue Jean Poiré 95210 Saint Gratien / FR | 02 /
Issachar, Nathalie 15 rue des Perchamps 75016 Paris / FR | 03 /
Lindermeier, Tanja 21 rue Victor Hugo 78230 Le Pecq / FR | 04 /
Nkengne, Alex 23 rue Hoche 92240 Malakoff / FR | [2008/24] | Representative(s) | Metten, Karl-Heinz, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/24] | Metten, Karl-Heinz, et al Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06291720.8 | 31.10.2006 | [2008/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1929951 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1929951 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61B7/00, A61B5/103, G01N19/02, G01N29/14, G01N29/22, G01N29/44 | [2008/24] | CPC: |
A61B5/442 (EP);
A61B10/00 (KR);
A61B5/6843 (EP);
A61B8/08 (EP);
A61B8/42 (EP);
A61B2562/0204 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/24] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur akustischen Bestimmung von Hauttexturen | [2008/24] | English: | Acoustic system and method for evaluation skin texture | [2008/24] | French: | Système et procédé pour la détermination acoustique des textures de la peau | [2008/24] | Examination procedure | 26.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/24] | 03.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.07.2009 | BE | 29.07.2009 | CY | 29.07.2009 | CZ | 29.07.2009 | DK | 29.07.2009 | EE | 29.07.2009 | FI | 29.07.2009 | LT | 29.07.2009 | LV | 29.07.2009 | NL | 29.07.2009 | PL | 29.07.2009 | RO | 29.07.2009 | SE | 29.07.2009 | SI | 29.07.2009 | SK | 29.07.2009 | TR | 29.07.2009 | BG | 29.10.2009 | GR | 30.10.2009 | IS | 29.11.2009 | PT | 29.11.2009 | HU | 30.01.2010 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
BE | 29.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2009 | ||
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
HU | 30.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/03] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
BE | 29.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2009 | ||
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/26] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
BE | 29.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2009 | ||
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/16] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/14] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4330752 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1,5,7 * page 4, lines 2-22 * * page 4, lines 54-64 * * figures 1,3 *; | [X]FR2811764 (ASSERIN JEROME HENRI [FR]) [X] 1-7,9 * abstract * * page 2, lines 9-19 * * figure 1 *; | [X]WO2005085805 (CENTRE NAT RECH SCIENT [FR], et al) [X] 1,5,7 * abstract * * claims 1,2 ** figures 2,4 * |