EP1925615 - Method of fluorine-18 labelling of tropane derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orphachem Biopôle Clermont Limagne 63360 Saint-Beauzire / FR | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | For all designated states L'UNIVERSITE DE TOURS 3 rue des Tanneurs BP 4103 37041 Tours Cedex 1 / FR | [2015/45] |
Former [2015/29] | For all designated states Orphachem Rue Montalembert Centre d'Accueil Entreprises - Unité INSERM 484 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | ||
For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states L'UNIVERSITE DE TOURS 3 rue des Tanneurs BP 4103 37041 Tours Cedex 1 / FR | |||
Former [2010/25] | For all designated states Orphachem Rue Montalembert Centre d'Accueil Entreprises - Unité INSERM 484 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | ||
For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment "Le Ponant D" 25, rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states L'UNIVERSITE DE TOURS 3 rue des Tanneurs BP 4103 37041 Tours Cedex 1 / FR | |||
Former [2009/22] | For all designated states Orphachem Rue Montalembert Centre d'Accueil Entreprises - Unité INSERM 484 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | ||
For all designated states Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique Etablissement Public à caractère Industriel et Commercial 25 rue Leblanc Immeuble "Le Ponant D" 75015 Paris / FR | |||
For all designated states L'UNIVERSITE DE TOURS 3 rue des Tanneurs BP 4103 37041 Tours Cedex 1 / FR | |||
Former [2008/22] | For all designated states Orphachem Rue Montalembert Centre d'Accueil Entreprises - Unité INSERM 484 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dolle, Frédéric 10 allée de Villeneuve 91940 Gometz-le-Chatel / FR | 02 /
Emond, Patrick 18 rue du Commerce 37210 Vouvray / FR | 03 /
Le Gailliard, Joël Le Blitou 63160 Reignat / FR | 04 /
Hinnen, Françoise 22 rue de la Petite Fontaine 91430 Vauhallan / FR | 05 /
Helfenbein, Julie 39 rue Bonnabaud 63000 Clermond-Ferrand / FR | [2008/22] | Representative(s) | Colombet, Alain André, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, Rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/29] | Colombet, Alain André, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | ||
Former [2010/29] | Colombet, Alain André, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | ||
Former [2008/22] | Colombet, Alain André, et al Cabinet Lavoix, 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06291762.0 | 14.11.2006 | [2008/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1925615 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1925615 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07D451/02 | [2008/22] | CPC: |
C07D451/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/29] |
Former [2008/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Fluor-18 Markierung von Tropan Derivaten | [2015/16] | English: | Method of fluorine-18 labelling of tropane derivatives | [2008/22] | French: | Methode de marquage de fluor-18 des derives du tropane | [2015/16] |
Former [2008/22] | Verfahren zur Fluor-18 Markierung von Tropan Derivaten | ||
Former [2008/22] | Méthode de marquage de fluor-18 des dérivés du tropane | Examination procedure | 28.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 21.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.07.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 05.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.07.2015 | EE | 15.07.2015 | LT | 15.07.2015 | LV | 15.07.2015 | IS | 15.11.2015 | [2017/40] |
Former [2016/22] | EE | 15.07.2015 | |
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | LT | 15.07.2015 | |
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | LT | 15.07.2015 | |
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 15.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9639198 (RES BIOCHEMICALS LIMITED PARTN [US]) [X] 1-13,17,18 * page 23, lines 1-13; page 32, line 16-page 33, line 5; Examples 15,16,18,26; claims 1, 4, 5, 8,10, 12,16,19, 21 *; | [X]US5698179 (NEUMEYER JOHN L [US], et al) [X] 1-13,17,18 * column 15, line 32 - column 16, line 6; example 22; claims 1,5,8,10 *; | [A]US6344179 (GOODMAN MARK M [US], et al) [A] 1-18* column 9, line 52 - column 10, line 42; claim 1 * |