EP1806955 - Ballast for discharge lamp and method of driving said ballast [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VALEO VISION 34, rue Saint-André 93012 Bobigny Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/28] | For all designated states VALEO VISION 34, rue Saint-André 93012 Bobigny Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nicolai, Jean-Marc 18, rue Blondel 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2007/28] | Application number, filing date | 06292014.5 | 21.12.2006 | [2007/28] | Priority number, date | FR20060000095 | 05.01.2006 Original published format: FR 0600095 | [2007/28] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1806955 | Date: | 11.07.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H05B41/288 | [2007/28] | CPC: |
H05B41/2881 (EP,US);
Y02B20/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/28] | Title | German: | Vorschaltgerät für Gasentladungslampe und Verfahren zur Steuerung des Vorschaltgerätes | [2007/28] | English: | Ballast for discharge lamp and method of driving said ballast | [2007/28] | French: | Ballast de lampe à décharge gazeuse et procédé de pilotage de ce ballast | [2007/28] | Examination procedure | 05.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/03] | 21.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/39] | 16.05.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/39] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.01.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2017 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0684755 (MAGNETI MARELLI SPA [IT]) [X] 1-11 * column 1, lines 4-29 * * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 40 * * column 4, line 41 - column 6, line 13 * * figures 1-3 *; | [X]EP0684754 (MAGNETI MARELLI SPA [IT]) [X] 1-8 * column 1, line 49 - column 5, line 13 * * figures 1,2,4 *; | [A]US6366030 (ITO MASAYASU [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document * |