EP1802145 - Method and apparatus for presenting contact information in a mobile communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.05.2008 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.07.2008 [2008/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FRANCE TELECOM 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/26] | For all designated states France Telecom 6 Place d'Alleray 75015 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chesnais, Pascal 152 New Bridge Road Sudbury MA 01776 / US | 02 /
Wheeler, Patrick Sean 26 Harley Street - Apt. 1 Boston MA 02124 / US | 03 /
Pomeroy, Stephen 41 Edge Hill Road Chestnut Hill MA 02467 / US | [2007/26] | Application number, filing date | 06301285.0 | 21.12.2006 | [2007/26] | Priority number, date | US20050317473 | 22.12.2005 Original published format: US 317473 | [2007/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1802145 | Date: | 27.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04Q7/22 | [2007/26] | CPC: |
H04W4/023 (EP,US);
H04L67/52 (EP,US);
H04L67/535 (EP,US);
H04L67/54 (EP,US);
H04M1/2757 (EP,US);
H04W4/02 (EP);
H04W4/08 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2008/10] |
Former [2007/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Bereitstellung von Kontakinformationen in einem mobilen Kommunikationssystem | [2007/26] | English: | Method and apparatus for presenting contact information in a mobile communication system | [2007/26] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour la fourniture d'informations de contact dans un système de communication mobile | [2007/26] | Examination procedure | 28.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/27] | 05.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2008/27] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0022860 (DEGNBOL JANUS FRIIS [DK]) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [X]EP1176840 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-20* the whole document * |