|
07.07.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.06.2015 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.04.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
16 |
|
14.04.2015 |
F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.04.2015 |
F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
09.04.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Description |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
13 |
|
13.03.2015 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.03.2015 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2015 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2015 |
F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.03.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.01.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.12.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.12.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2014 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.12.2014 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.11.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.11.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
18.11.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.2014 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.09.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.09.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
28 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
29.08.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.08.2014 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
37 |
|
01.07.2014 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.07.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.07.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.06.2014 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
3 |
|
12.06.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2014 |
F3303.14 Composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2014 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2014 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2014 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
25 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
04.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2014 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.02.2014 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.02.2014 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
18 |
|
04.02.2014 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
28 |
|
04.02.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
33 |
|
10.12.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2013 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.12.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.12.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.12.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.12.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.11.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.11.2013 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2013 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.11.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.11.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.11.2013 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
19.09.2013 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.08.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
24 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.08.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
24 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
19.08.2013 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.08.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2013 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
14.08.2013 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.08.2013 |
Non-scannable object |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.07.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.07.2013 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.07.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
27.06.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.06.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.06.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.06.2013 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.06.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.06.2013 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.06.2013 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.06.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.06.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.05.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.05.2013 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.04.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.04.2013 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.11.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.11.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2012 |
Description |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.11.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
30.11.2012 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
32 |
|
17.09.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.09.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.09.2012 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.09.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.09.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2012 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2012 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
29.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
29.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
29.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
29.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
29.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
29.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
29.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
29.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
29.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
29.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
29.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
29.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
12 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2012 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
27 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
35 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
21.06.2012 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
11.04.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.04.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.09.2011 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2011 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2011 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
25.11.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2010 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2010 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.11.2010 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.11.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2010 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2010 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2010 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.05.2010 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.12.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2007 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2007 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2007 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.08.2007 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.08.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2007 |
Authorisation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.07.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2007 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.08.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
20.07.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.07.2006 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
34 |