|
19.03.2015 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.02.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.02.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
02.02.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.02.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2014 |
F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.08.2014 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
9 |
|
30.07.2014 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
8 |
|
21.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.05.2014 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.05.2014 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.05.2014 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.05.2014 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.07.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.07.2013 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.07.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
29.05.2013 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.04.2013 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.04.2013 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.03.2013 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.03.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2013 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2013 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2013 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.03.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.03.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.03.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.03.2013 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.03.2013 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
07.12.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.11.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.11.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2011 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2011 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.05.2011 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2011 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.01.2011 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.11.2010 |
Reply to the communication concerning admissibility of an opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.10.2010 |
Communication indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition which may be remedied |
Opposition |
2 |
|
22.10.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
25 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
64 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
28 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
30.09.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.12.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2009 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2009 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.10.2009 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.09.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.09.2009 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.09.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.09.2009 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.08.2009 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.06.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.06.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.06.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.12.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2007 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2007 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2007 |
Refund order search fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2007 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.08.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
15.06.2007 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.06.2007 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
05.09.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
10.08.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2006 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
18 |