EP2029844 - DAMPING DEVICE FOR MOVABLE PARTS, IN PARTICULAR FOR HINGES OR EXTENDABLE OR PIVOTABLE FURNITURE PARTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amboina AG Metallstrasse 9a 6304 Zug / CH | [2009/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAUCH, Augustin Innengestaltung Sägagasse 81 A-6811 Schnifis / AT | [2009/10] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/20] |
Former [2009/10] | Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06707021.9 | 16.02.2006 | [2009/10] | WO2006EP01423 | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007093191 | Date: | 23.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2029844 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.08.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2029844 | Date: | 06.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | E05D11/08 | [2009/10] | CPC: |
E05D11/084 (EP);
E05F5/006 (EP);
E05D11/06 (EP);
E05D5/08 (EP);
E05F1/12 (EP);
E05F1/1215 (EP);
E05Y2201/21 (EP);
E05Y2201/26 (EP);
E05Y2201/266 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DAMPFTINGSEINRURICHTUNG FÜR BEWEGLICHE TEILE, INSBESONDERE FÜR SCHARNIERE ODER AUSFAHRBARE ODER VERSCHWENKBARE MÖBELTEILE | [2009/10] | English: | DAMPING DEVICE FOR MOVABLE PARTS, IN PARTICULAR FOR HINGES OR EXTENDABLE OR PIVOTABLE FURNITURE PARTS | [2009/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AMORTISSEMENT POUR PIECES MOBILES ET EN PARTICULIER POUR CHARNIERES OU ELEMENTS DE MEUBLE EXTRACTIBLES OU PIVOTANTS | [2009/10] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2008 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 06.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Public notification(s) | Mitteilung über das Erlöschen der Vertretungsmacht des Vertreters EPA Form 2505B datum 13.04.2011. | Amboina AG Metallstrasse 9a 6304 Zug / CH | [2011/35] | Opposition(s) | 07.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/37] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 29.01.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 29.01.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.02.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 22.12.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 22.12.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.01.2009 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 22.12.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 22.12.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.01.2009 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 22.12.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 22.12.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 26.01.2009 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 16.09.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   22.12.2008 | 28.02.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   31.08.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 06.10.2010 | CZ | 06.10.2010 | DK | 06.10.2010 | EE | 06.10.2010 | FI | 06.10.2010 | HU | 06.10.2010 | IE | 06.10.2010 | IT | 06.10.2010 | LT | 06.10.2010 | LV | 06.10.2010 | NL | 06.10.2010 | PL | 06.10.2010 | RO | 06.10.2010 | SE | 06.10.2010 | SI | 06.10.2010 | SK | 06.10.2010 | TR | 06.10.2010 | BG | 06.01.2011 | GR | 07.01.2011 | ES | 17.01.2011 | IS | 06.02.2011 | PT | 07.02.2011 | AT | 16.02.2011 | GB | 16.02.2011 | LU | 16.02.2011 | BE | 28.02.2011 | CH | 28.02.2011 | FR | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 06.10.2010 | |
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
IT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
TR | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
AT | 16.02.2011 | ||
GB | 16.02.2011 | ||
LU | 16.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 06.10.2010 | |
CZ | 06.10.2010 | ||
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
IT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
AT | 16.02.2011 | ||
GB | 16.02.2011 | ||
LU | 16.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
IT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
AT | 16.02.2011 | ||
GB | 16.02.2011 | ||
LU | 16.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
IT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
AT | 16.02.2011 | ||
GB | 16.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
IT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
GB | 16.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/06] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
IT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
IT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
RO | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
DK | 06.10.2010 | ||
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
PL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
SK | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CZ | 06.10.2010 | |
EE | 06.10.2010 | ||
FI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | FI | 06.10.2010 | |
IE | 06.10.2010 | ||
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
ES | 17.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | FI | 06.10.2010 | |
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
NL | 06.10.2010 | ||
SE | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
BG | 06.01.2011 | ||
GR | 07.01.2011 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
PT | 07.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 06.10.2010 | |
LT | 06.10.2010 | ||
LV | 06.10.2010 | ||
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
IS | 06.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 06.10.2010 | |
SI | 06.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/17] | SI | 06.10.2010 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE4406824 (KUEHL HANS [DE]) [X] 1,18-20 * figures 1,15,16; claims 1,7,11 *; | [Y]DE20104100U (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]) [Y] 16,17* page 4, paragraph 5 - paragraph 7; figure 14 *; | [X]EP1160467 (NOKIA CORP [FI]) [X] 1,13,14 * figures 1-5; claims 1-3,6,9 *; | [XY]WO03023172 (LORD CORP [US]) [X] 1-3,8-12,15,18-20 * paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0073]; figures 15a,15b * [Y] 16,17 | by applicant | DE4406824 | EP1199433 | WO03023172 | EP1344885 |