|
08.08.2018 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.10.2017 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2017 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.08.2017 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2017 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.08.2017 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2017 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
18.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.08.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
18.08.2016 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.08.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.08.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.08.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
18.08.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
17.06.2016 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2016 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.02.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.02.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.10.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.10.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.10.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.10.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.10.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.10.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.07.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.07.2015 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.03.2015 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.03.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
12.03.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.01.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.12.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.06.2014 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.02.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
23.10.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2013 |
Text: Decision / Communication |
Appeal |
13 |
|
23.10.2013 |
Text: Decision / Communication |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
02.04.2013 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.03.2012 |
F3045 Inadmissibility of the appeal: missing address / missing name |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.12.2011 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2011 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.08.2011 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
09.08.2011 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
04.06.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.06.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.06.2011 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.04.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.04.2011 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
23.02.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
23.02.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.02.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
24.09.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.09.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.09.2010 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.09.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.09.2010 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.09.2010 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
21.07.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.07.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.06.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.01.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.07.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.03.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.03.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.11.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.10.2007 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.10.2007 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.09.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
27.07.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.07.2007 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.07.2007 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.10.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
14.09.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.09.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.09.2006 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
18 |