EP1920334 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINISTIC GARBAGE COLLECTION IN A VIRTUAL MACHINE ENVIRONMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.03.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2021 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 11.08.2021 [2021/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oracle International Corporation M/S 50P7 500 Oracle Parkway Redwood Shores, CA 94065 / US | [2018/32] |
Former [2010/50] | For all designated states Oracle International Corporation M/S 50P7, 500 Oracle Parkway Redwood Shores, CA 94065 / US | ||
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Bea Systems, Inc. 2315 North First Street San Jose California 95131 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LINDHOLM, David Baboudsgatan 20 S-12064 Stockholm / SE | 02 /
JOELSON, Mattias Masselgrand 9 S-5-19138 Sollentuna / SE | 03 /
PEURA, Noora Gammelvagen 2 S-14637 Tullinge / SE | [2008/20] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/32] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2010/15] | Davies, Simon Robert, et al D Young & Co 120 Holborn London, EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2008/20] | Crawford, Andrew Birkby, et al A.A. Thornton & Co., 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 06719885.3 | 30.01.2006 | [2008/20] | WO2006US03238 | Priority number, date | US20050182137 | 15.07.2005 Original published format: US 182137 | [2008/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007011422 | Date: | 25.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/04] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1920334 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1920334 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.12.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/02 | [2018/09] | CPC: |
G06F12/0269 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/20] | G06F12/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/32] |
Former [2008/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR DETERMINISTISCHEN MÜLLABFUHR IN DER UMGEBUNG EINER VIRTUELLEN MASCHINE | [2008/20] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR DETERMINISTIC GARBAGE COLLECTION IN A VIRTUAL MACHINE ENVIRONMENT | [2008/20] | French: | SYSTEME ET METHODE POUR UNE COLLECTE DE DECHETS DETERMINISTE DANS UN ENVIRONNEMENT DE MACHINE VIRTUELLE | [2008/20] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2008 | Search fee paid | 04.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 05.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 02.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.08.2009 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.01.2006 | AT | 08.08.2018 | CY | 08.08.2018 | CZ | 08.08.2018 | DK | 08.08.2018 | EE | 08.08.2018 | ES | 08.08.2018 | FI | 08.08.2018 | IT | 08.08.2018 | LT | 08.08.2018 | LV | 08.08.2018 | MC | 08.08.2018 | NL | 08.08.2018 | PL | 08.08.2018 | RO | 08.08.2018 | SE | 08.08.2018 | SI | 08.08.2018 | SK | 08.08.2018 | TR | 08.08.2018 | BG | 08.11.2018 | GR | 09.11.2018 | IS | 08.12.2018 | PT | 08.12.2018 | IE | 30.01.2019 | LU | 30.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | CH | 31.01.2019 | FR | 31.01.2019 | LI | 31.01.2019 | [2021/32] |
Former [2021/26] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CY | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
PT | 08.12.2018 | ||
IE | 30.01.2019 | ||
LU | 30.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
PT | 08.12.2018 | ||
IE | 30.01.2019 | ||
LU | 30.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
IE | 30.01.2019 | ||
LU | 30.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
IE | 30.01.2019 | ||
LU | 30.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
LU | 30.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
LU | 30.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
LU | 30.01.2019 | ||
FR | 31.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
LU | 30.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 08.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004111448 (GARTHWAITE ALEXANDER T [US]) [X] 1,2,6-8 * figure 4 * * paragraph [0020] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0075] ** paragraph [0148] * | International search | [Y]US5873104 (TREMBLAY MARC [US], et al); | [Y]US6839725 (AGESEN OLE [US], et al) | by applicant | US2004111448 |