|
16.10.2018 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.07.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
15 |
|
26.06.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.06.2018 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.05.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.05.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.05.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.02.2018 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
15.02.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.02.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.02.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.01.2018 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.2017 |
F3303.17 Change of the composition of the Board (T), in case Chairman is a legal member |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2017 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.02.2016 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the postal address of the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2014 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2012 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.11.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
02.11.2012 |
Claims |
Appeal |
5 |
|
02.11.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.11.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
3 |
|
02.11.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.09.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.07.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2012 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.07.2012 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.07.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
03.07.2012 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.06.2012 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.06.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.05.2012 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.04.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.04.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.01.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.01.2012 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.01.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.01.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.08.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.08.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.06.2011 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.06.2011 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
07.06.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.06.2011 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2011 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.02.2011 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2010 |
Communication concerning deficiencies in subsequently filed documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.06.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.02.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.02.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.09.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.08.2009 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.08.2009 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
27.04.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.04.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
17.11.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.11.2008 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.09.2008 |
Communication concerning deficiencies in subsequently filed documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.09.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.09.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.02.2008 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2007 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.11.2007 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.10.2007 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
18.09.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2007 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.08.2007 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.09.2006 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
30 |
|
18.05.2006 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2006 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
31.03.2006 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
31.03.2006 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
31.03.2006 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
19 |
|
31.03.2006 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
17.03.2006 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
17.03.2006 |
Annex |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
17.03.2006 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
17.03.2006 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
19 |
|
17.03.2006 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |