EP1864147 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MEASURING THE AMOUNT OF THE CURRENT IN BATTERY CELLS USING A PLURALITY OF SENSING RESISTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.03.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.04.2018 [2018/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Chem, Ltd. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu, Seoul 150-721 / KR | [2007/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choi, Jin Ho 17-3 Gwarim-dong, Siheung-si Gyeonggi-do 429-120 / KR | [2007/50] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2017/18] | Cabinet Plasseraud 66 rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2008/35] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2007/50] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 06732760.1 | 31.03.2006 | [2007/50] | WO2006KR01187 | Priority number, date | KR20050027038 | 31.03.2005 Original published format: KR 20050027038 | [2007/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006104361 | Date: | 05.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1864147 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1864147 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 05.10.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01R31/36 | [2007/50] | CPC: |
G01R15/002 (EP,US);
G01R31/36 (KR);
G01R19/16542 (EP,US);
G01R31/386 (EP,US);
G01R1/203 (EP,US);
G01R31/382 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/18] |
Former [2008/28] | DE, FR, GB | ||
Former [2007/50] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG DER STROMMENGE IN BATTERIEZELLEN UNTER VERWENDUNG MEHRERER MESSWIDERSTÄNDE | [2007/50] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR MEASURING THE AMOUNT OF THE CURRENT IN BATTERY CELLS USING A PLURALITY OF SENSING RESISTORS | [2007/50] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ POUR LA MESURE D'UNE QUANTITÉ DE COURANT DANS DES ÉLÉMENTS D'ACCUMULATEUR UTILISANT UNE PLURALITÉ DE RESISTANCES DE DÉTECTION | [2016/48] |
Former [2007/50] | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE POUR LA MESURE D'UNE QUANTITE DE COURANT DANS DES ELEMENTS D'ACCUMULATEUR UTILISANT UNE PLURALITE DE RESISTANCES DE DETECTION | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 19.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 23.06.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.02.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2008 | Opposition(s) | 06.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4707795 (ALBER CARL H [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 10, lines 34-65; figure 3 *; | [A]US6014030 (SMITH GREGORY J [US], et al) [A] 1,3* figures 1-3 * | International search | [A]US5592095 (MEADOWS VERNON [US]); | [A]JPH09171065 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [A]US6014030 (SMITH GREGORY J [US], et al); | [A]US6285191 (GOLLOMP BERNARD P [US], et al); | [A]JP2002048849 (SANYO ELECTRIC CO) | Examination | WO9927628 | DE10343179 | by applicant | US4707795 | WO9927628 | US6014030 |