EP1858440 - IMPROVED METAL ALLOYS FOR MEDICAL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MiRus LLC 1755 W. Oak Parkway Marietta, GA 30062 / US | [2022/02] |
Former [2007/48] | For all designated states Icon Medical Corp. 1414, South Green Road, Suite 309 Cleveland, OH 44121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PATEL, Udayan 6508 Deer Hollow Drive San Jose, California 95120 / US | 02 /
FURST, Joseph, G. 4948 Corliss Drive Lyndhurst, Ohio 44124 / US | 03 /
BUCKMAN, Raymond, W., JR. 272 Picture Drive Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15236 / US | [2007/48] | Representative(s) | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schloss Schellenberg - Backhaus Renteilichtung 1 45134 Essen / DE | [2024/17] |
Former [2008/31] | Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Frühlingstrasse 43A 45133 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2008/30] | Schumacher, Horst, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Frühlingstrasse 43 A 45133 Essen / DE | ||
Former [2007/48] | Schumacher, Horst, et al Grosse Bockhorni Schumacher Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Frühlingstrasse 43A 45133 Essen / DE | Application number, filing date | 06733915.0 | 24.01.2006 | [2007/48] | WO2006US02741 | Priority number, date | US20050658226P | 03.03.2005 Original published format: US 658226 P | US20050694881P | 29.06.2005 Original published format: US 694881 P | US20050694891P | 29.06.2005 Original published format: US 694891 P | US20050739688P | 23.11.2005 Original published format: US 739688 P | [2007/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006096251 | Date: | 14.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1858440 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1858440 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.03.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C22C27/00, C22C30/00, C22C27/04, C22F1/18, B22F3/16, B22F5/10, A61P7/02, A61P9/00, A61P35/00, A61P37/06, A61P43/00, // A61F2/91, B22F3/24 | [2023/49] | CPC: |
B22F3/16 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
B22F5/10 (EP,US);
C22C27/00 (EP,US);
C22C27/04 (EP,US);
C22C30/00 (EP,US);
C22F1/18 (EP,US);
A61F2/91 (EP,US);
B22F2003/248 (EP,US);
B22F2998/00 (EP,US);
B22F2998/10 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/00, B22F5/106 (EP,US);
B22F2998/10, B22F1/09, B22F3/04, B22F3/10, B22F3/20, B22F3/24 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00, B22F3/04, B22F2201/10, B22F2201/01, B22F2201/20 (EP,US);
B22F2999/00, B22F3/10, B22F2201/10, B22F2201/01, B22F2201/20 (US,EP); |
Former IPC [2011/13] | A61F2/06, C22C27/00, C22C30/00 | ||
Former IPC [2007/48] | A61F2/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2024/17] |
Former [2007/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE METALLLEGIERUNGEN FÜR EIN MEDIZINPRODUKT | [2007/48] | English: | IMPROVED METAL ALLOYS FOR MEDICAL DEVICE | [2007/48] | French: | ALLIAGES METALLIQUES AMELIORES POUR DISPOSITIFS MEDICAUX | [2007/48] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 18.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07) | 21.07.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 30.09.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.06.2013 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 30.09.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 30.09.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 15.10.2020 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 10.05.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 10.05.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.09.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 18.01.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 18.01.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.02.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 08.04.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 12.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 03.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 11.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 22.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2013 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   24.06.2013 | 31.01.2018 | 13   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.2018 | 31.01.2019 | 14   M06   Fee paid on   08.04.2019 | 31.01.2020 | 15   M06   Fee paid on   12.02.2020 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]SU333209 (HIGH MELTING METALS AND H) [A] 1-18,30-37* the whole document *; | [A]EP0608817 (SANDVIK AB [SE]) [A] 1-18,30-37 * claims 1-10 * * table 2 *; | [XAI]EP0700685 (JAPAN ENERGY CORP [JP]) [X] 1,3-7,10 * claims 1-45 * * tables 2, 4 * [A] 2,8,9,31 [I] 11-18,30,32-37; | [A]EP0756853 (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM [US]) [A] 1-18,30-37 * claims 1-20 * * column 3, line 45 - column 9, line 43 *; | [A]EP0875218 (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM [US]) [A] 1-18,30-37 * claims 1-29 * * column 4, line 35 - column 12, line 47 *; | [A]WO0141678 (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM [US]) [A] 1-18,30-37 * claims 1-20 * * page 3, line 25 - page 10, line 17 *; | [A]WO0145787 (ADVANCED CARDIOVASCULAR SYSTEM [US]) [A] 1-18,30-37 * claims 1-25 * * page 7, line 5 - page 15, line 25 *; | [A]US2004000046 (STINSON JONATHAN S [US]) [A] 1-18,30-37 * claims 1-61 * * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0046] *; | [A]WO2004003240 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-18,30-37 * claims 1-23 * * page 6, line 25 - page 12, line 19 *; | [X]WO2004022122 (SCIMED LIFE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-18,30-37 * claims 1-21 * * page 3, line 12 - page 5, line 23 * | International search | [Y]US5252288 (YAMAMOTO SUSUMU [JP], et al); | [Y]US5437744 (CARLEN JAN C [US]); | [Y]US5609629 (FEARNOT NEAL E [US], et al); | [Y]US6253443 (JOHNSON MICHAEL W [US]); | [Y]US6334856 (ALLEN MARK G [US], et al); | [Y]US2004049261 (XU YIXIN [US]); | [Y] - MUELLER, A.J. ET AL., EVALUATION OF OXIDE DISPERSION STRENGTHENED (ODS) MOLYBDENUM AND MOLYBDENUM-RHENIUM ALLOYS B-T-3148, (1999), pages 1 - 18, XP008122954 | [Y] - "Technology status of molybdenum and tungsten alloys", KLOPP, W.D., Space Nuclear Power Systems, (1984), pages 359 - 369, XP008122955 | by applicant | US6206916 | US6436133 | WO2004022122 | US2004093076 | US2004093077 | US20050658226 | US20050694881 | US20050694891 | US20050739688 |