|
22.02.2019 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2018 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2017 |
Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2017 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.11.2017 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.11.2017 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.11.2017 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
02.11.2017 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
13.09.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.09.2017 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.08.2017 |
Communication concerning deficiencies in subsequently filed documents |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.08.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.08.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Search / examination |
38 |
|
09.08.2017 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
09.08.2017 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.06.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2017 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.06.2017 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.05.2017 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.03.2017 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.03.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.03.2017 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
9 |
|
13.03.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.01.2017 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.03.2014 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.03.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.03.2014 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.03.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.03.2014 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
8 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.01.2014 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.11.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.10.2013 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2013 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
31.10.2013 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.10.2013 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.10.2013 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2013 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.10.2013 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.10.2013 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2013 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.05.2013 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.05.2013 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2013 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.04.2013 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2012 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.12.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.10.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.09.2012 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.09.2012 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.08.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.06.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.06.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.06.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.06.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2012 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.05.2012 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
20.04.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2011 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.12.2011 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.12.2011 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
07.12.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.11.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.11.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.11.2011 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.11.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.11.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2011 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2011 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2011 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.10.2011 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.08.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.08.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.08.2011 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.02.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.10.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.10.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.09.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.09.2009 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
08.09.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.05.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.05.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2007 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.10.2007 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.09.2007 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.08.2007 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
30.08.2007 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.07.2007 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.01.2007 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2007 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.01.2007 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.01.2007 |
International preliminary examination report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.01.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.01.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - free text sheet |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.01.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.01.2007 |
International preliminary examination report - points I-VIII |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
2 |
|
26.01.2007 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
26.01.2007 |
Transmittal of International Preliminary Examination Report |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.12.2006 |
Free text |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.12.2006 |
Notification of documents sent to WIPO |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
28.12.2006 |
Notification of receipt of demand |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
20.12.2006 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
4 |
|
18.12.2006 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
1 |
|
18.12.2006 |
PCT demand form |
PCT Chapter 2 procedure |
3 |
|
27.09.2006 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
50 |
|
08.09.2006 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.09.2006 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
41 |