EP1861301 - TECHNIQUES FOR EMPLOYING ELECTRIC BRAKES TO CONTROL MOVEMENT OF ROTATABLE COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.10.2010 [2010/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HR TEXTRON INC. 25200 West Rye Canyon Road Santa Clarita, CA 91355 / US | [2007/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
O'NEILL, Robert John 28070 N. Caraway Lane Santa Clarita, California 91350 / US | [2007/49] | Representative(s) | Flutter, Paula, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/49] | Flutter, Paula, et al EIP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06735970.3 | 23.02.2006 | [2007/49] | WO2006US06518 | Priority number, date | US20050081437 | 16.03.2005 Original published format: US 81437 | [2007/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006101662 | Date: | 28.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1861301 | Date: | 05.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1861301 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.09.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B60T13/74, B60T8/32, B64C25/42 | [2007/49] | CPC: |
B60T13/74 (EP,US);
B60T8/325 (EP,US);
B64C25/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/26] |
Former [2007/49] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ANWENDUNG ELEKTRISCHER BREMSEN ZUR STEUERUNG DER BEWEGUNG DREHBARER KOMPONENTEN | [2007/49] | English: | TECHNIQUES FOR EMPLOYING ELECTRIC BRAKES TO CONTROL MOVEMENT OF ROTATABLE COMPONENTS | [2007/49] | French: | TECHNIQUES D'UTILISATION DE FREINS ELECTRIQUES POUR CONTROLER LE MOUVEMENT DE COMPOSANTS ROTATIFS | [2007/49] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.10.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/49] | 25.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4175646 (EIKELBERGER BRUCE H [US]) [X] 8,9,18* figure 2 *; | [XA]US2003029680 (RALEA MIHAI [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-9,18-20 * figures 1-5,10,11 * [A] 3-6,9-17 |