EP1856454 - MULTIPOINT AIR SAMPLING SYSTEM HAVING COMMON SENSORS TO PROVIDE BLENDED AIR QUALITY PARAMETER INFORMATION FOR MONITORING AND BUILDING CONTROL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 15.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aircuity Incorporated 39 Chapel Street Newton, MA 02458 / US | [2017/25] |
Former [2007/47] | For all designated states Aircuity Incorporated 39 Chapel Street Newton, MA 02458 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DESROCHERS, Eric, M. 49 Dover Road Millis, MA 02054 / US | 02 /
SHARP, Gordon, P. 89 Annawan Road Newton, MA 02468 / US | [2007/47] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Richard Eric Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2017/25] |
Former [2007/47] | Jones, Graham Henry Graham Jones & Company Blackheath 77 Beaconsfield Road London SE3 7LG / GB | Application number, filing date | 06738073.3 | 10.03.2006 | [2007/47] | WO2006US08967 | Priority number, date | US20050660245P | 10.03.2005 Original published format: US 660245 P | [2007/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006099337 | Date: | 21.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/38] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1856454 | Date: | 21.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1856454 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.11.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.05.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F24F11/00, G01F23/00 | [2007/47] | CPC: |
F24F3/0442 (EP,US);
F24F11/0001 (EP,US);
F24F11/30 (EP,US);
F24F11/46 (EP,US);
F24F11/63 (EP,US);
F24F11/76 (EP,US);
F24F3/044 (EP,US);
G01N1/26 (EP,US);
F24F2110/10 (EP,US);
F24F2110/20 (EP,US);
F24F2110/50 (EP,US);
F24F2110/66 (EP,US);
F24F2110/70 (EP,US);
F24F2120/00 (EP,US);
G01N1/2273 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/25] |
Former [2007/47] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR LUFTPROBENNAHME AN MEHREREN STELLEN MIT GEMEINSAMEN SENSOREN ZUM BEREITSTELLEN VON GESAMTPARAMETERN DER LUFTQUALITÄT ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG UND GEBÄUDESTEUERUNG | [2007/47] | English: | MULTIPOINT AIR SAMPLING SYSTEM HAVING COMMON SENSORS TO PROVIDE BLENDED AIR QUALITY PARAMETER INFORMATION FOR MONITORING AND BUILDING CONTROL | [2007/47] | French: | SYSTEME D'ECHANTILLONNAGE DE L'AIR MULTIPOINT EQUIPE DE CAPTEURS CLASSIQUES, PERMETTANT D'OBTENIR DES INFORMATIONS RELATIVES A LA QUALITE DE L'AIR A DES FINS DE CONTROLE ET DE REGULATION DES FONCTIONS D'UN BATIMENT | [2007/47] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 07.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 07.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 04.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 18.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 15.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.03.2006 | AT | 21.06.2017 | CY | 21.06.2017 | CZ | 21.06.2017 | EE | 21.06.2017 | FI | 21.06.2017 | IT | 21.06.2017 | LT | 21.06.2017 | LV | 21.06.2017 | MC | 21.06.2017 | NL | 21.06.2017 | PL | 21.06.2017 | PT | 21.06.2017 | RO | 21.06.2017 | SI | 21.06.2017 | SK | 21.06.2017 | BG | 21.09.2017 | GR | 22.09.2017 | IS | 21.10.2017 | LU | 10.03.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 10.03.2006 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PT | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
LU | 10.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
LU | 10.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
IT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IS | 21.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 21.06.2017 | |
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
NL | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
LV | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
LT | 21.06.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE4333193 (SCHOETTLER LUNOS LUEFTUNG [DE]) [A] 1-35 * abstract *; | [A]US5742516 (OLCERST ROBERT [US]) [A] 1-35 * abstract *; | [A]WO0142718 (RAY HUDSON LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1-35* page 6, line 26 - page 7, line 16; figure 2 *; | [XI]DE20218363U (MELTEM WAERMERUECKGEWINNUNG GM [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-10,14-18,25,26,29,31-34 * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0114]; figures 5-7 * [I] 3,11-13,19-24,27,28,30,35 | International search | [Y]US5292280 (JANU GEORGE J [US], et al); | [A]US6609967 (SHARP GORDON P [US], et al); | [X]US6711470 (HARTENSTEIN STEVEN D [US], et al) | Examination | WO9846978 | US6241950 | by applicant | DE20218363U |