EP1866760 - STATISTICAL DELAY AND NOISE CALCULATION CONSIDERING CELL AND INTERCONNECT VARIATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.02.2010 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.02.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.03.2010 [2010/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Celik, Mustafa 1153 Loyola Drive Santa Clara CA 95051 / US | For all designated states Le, Jiayong 1047 Rich Ave Apt. 6 Mountain View CA 94040 / US | [2007/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LE, Jiayong 1047 Rich Avenue, 6 Mountain View, CA 94040 / US | [2007/51] | Representative(s) | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lancon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/51] | Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew, et al Kilburn & Strode 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06738668.0 | 17.03.2006 | [2007/51] | WO2006US09634 | Priority number, date | US20050663219P | 18.03.2005 Original published format: US 663219 P | [2007/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006102027 | Date: | 28.09.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1866760 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.09.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/50, G06F9/45 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
G06F30/3312 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/51] | G06F9/45, G06F17/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/51] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STATISTISCHE VERZÖGERUNGS- UND RAUSCHBERECHNUNG UNTER BERÜCKSICHTIGUNG VON ZELLEN- UND VERBINDUNGSSCHWANKUNGEN | [2007/51] | English: | STATISTICAL DELAY AND NOISE CALCULATION CONSIDERING CELL AND INTERCONNECT VARIATIONS | [2007/51] | French: | RETARD STATISTIQUE ET CALCUL DE BRUIT TENANT COMPTE DE VARIATIONS D'INTERCONNEXIONS ET DE CELLULES | [2007/51] | Entry into regional phase | 17.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/51] | 01.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/13] | 06.11.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - AGARWAL A ET AL, "Statistical timing analysis using bounds and selective enumeration", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMPUTER AIDED DESIGN OF INTEGRATED CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20030901), vol. 22, no. 9, ISSN 0278-0070, pages 1243 - 1260, XP011100303 [A] 1,4-6,11-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCAD.2003.816217 | International search | [X]US6496960 (KASHYAP CHANDRAMOULI V [US], et al); | [X]US6405348 (FALLAH-TEHRANI PEIVAND [US], et al) |