EP1864458 - Method and apparatus for data and pilot structures supporting equalization [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/50] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DATA AND PILOT STRUCTURES SUPPORTING EQUALIZATION | ||
[2012/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2012/49] |
Former [2007/50] | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALLADI, Durga Prasad 11983 Briarleaf Way San Diego, California 92128 / US | 02 /
GAAL, Peter 8304 Menkar Road San Diego, California 92126 / US | 03 /
WEI, Yongbin 12140 Brickellia Street San Diego, California 92129 / US | [2007/50] | Representative(s) | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstraße 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/49] | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/50] | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm WAGNER & GEYER Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06740061.4 | 29.03.2006 | [2007/50] | WO2006US11668 | Priority number, date | US20050666333P | 29.03.2005 Original published format: US 666333 P | US20060388535 | 24.03.2006 Original published format: US 388535 | [2007/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006105307 | Date: | 05.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1864458 | Date: | 12.12.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1864458 | Date: | 05.12.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L25/03, H04L25/02, H04L27/26 | [2012/23] | CPC: |
H04L25/03159 (EP,US);
H04L27/26 (KR);
H04L25/02 (KR);
H04L25/03012 (EP,US);
H04L27/2602 (EP,KR,US);
H04B2201/70701 (EP,US);
H04L2025/03414 (EP,US);
H04L25/0204 (EP,US);
H04L25/0224 (EP,US);
H04L27/2603 (EP,KR,US);
H04L27/26035 (EP,KR,US);
H04L27/2607 (EP,US);
H04L27/261 (EP,US);
H04W48/08 (EP,US);
H04W52/58 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/50] | H04L25/02, H04L27/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/50] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für entzerrungsunterstützende Daten- und Steuerungsstrukturen | [2012/29] | English: | Method and apparatus for data and pilot structures supporting equalization | [2012/29] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour des données et structures pilotes pour le support d'égalisation | [2012/29] |
Former [2007/50] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR ENTZERRUNGSUNTERSTÜTZENDE DATEN- UND STEUERUNGSSTRUKTUREN | ||
Former [2007/50] | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR DATA AND PILOT STRUCTURES SUPPORTING EQUALIZATION | ||
Former [2007/50] | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL POUR DES DONNEES ET STRUCTURES PILOTES POUR LE SUPPORT D'EGALISATION | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/50] | 09.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 22.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.01.2008 | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.03.2006 | AT | 05.12.2012 | BE | 05.12.2012 | CY | 05.12.2012 | CZ | 05.12.2012 | DK | 05.12.2012 | EE | 05.12.2012 | FI | 05.12.2012 | IT | 05.12.2012 | LT | 05.12.2012 | LV | 05.12.2012 | NL | 05.12.2012 | PL | 05.12.2012 | RO | 05.12.2012 | SE | 05.12.2012 | SI | 05.12.2012 | SK | 05.12.2012 | TR | 05.12.2012 | BG | 05.03.2013 | GR | 06.03.2013 | ES | 16.03.2013 | IE | 29.03.2013 | LU | 29.03.2013 | CH | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | FR | 02.04.2013 | IS | 05.04.2013 | PT | 05.04.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
TR | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IE | 29.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IE | 29.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IE | 29.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
IT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CY | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
DK | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/40] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
PT | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
NL | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
RO | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
CZ | 05.12.2012 | ||
EE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
SK | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
BG | 05.03.2013 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
IS | 05.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
BE | 05.12.2012 | ||
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 05.12.2012 | |
FI | 05.12.2012 | ||
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
SI | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
GR | 06.03.2013 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
LV | 05.12.2012 | ||
PL | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 05.12.2012 | |
LT | 05.12.2012 | ||
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
ES | 16.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 05.12.2012 | |
SE | 05.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 05.12.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2005004428 (INTEL CORP [US]) [X] 1-45 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * page 4, line 2 - line 21 * * page 5, lines 3-28 * * page 6, line 13 - line 29 * * page 7, line 14 - page 9, line 3 * * claims 1-4 *; | [X] - YONGHONG ZENG ET AL, "Pilot cyclic prefixed single carrier communication: channel estimation and equalization", IEEE SIGNAL PROCESSING LETTERS IEEE USA, (200501), vol. 12, no. 1, ISSN 1070-9908, pages 56 - 59, XP002391945 [X] 1-45 * abstract * * page 56 * * page 57, column 2 * * page 58, column 1 * * page 59, column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/LSP.2004.839698 | [X] - AL-DHAHIR N ET AL, "A new multicarrier transceiver based on the discrete cosine transform", WIRELESS COMMUNICATIONS AND NETWORKING CONFERENCE, 2005 IEEE NEW ORLEANS, LA, USA 13-17 MARCH 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20050313), ISBN 0-7803-8966-2, pages 45 - 50, XP010791153 [X] 1-45 * abstract * * page 45 - page 46 * * page 49, column 1 - column 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WCNC.2005.1424474 |