EP1874960 - LASER MICRODISSECTION AND MICROARRAY ANALYSIS OF BREAST TUMORS REVEAL ESTROGEN RECEPTOR RELATED GENES AND PATHWAYS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 26.03.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.04.2010 [2010/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Veridex, LLC 33 Technology Dr. Warren, NJ 07059 / US | For all designated states Lehnhardt, Susan One Johnson & Johnson Plaza New Brunswick 08933 / US | For all designated states Yu, Jack 11235 Affinity Court 64 San Diego, Ca 92121 / US | For all designated states Jiang, Yuqiu 7620 Marker Road San Diego, CA 92130 / US | For all designated states Yang, Fei 13067 Sunset Point Place San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2008/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Jack 11235 Affinity Court, no. 64 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 02 /
JIANG, Yuqiu 7620 Marker Road San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 03 /
YANG, Fei 13067 Sunset Point Place San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 04 /
WANG, Yixin 12511 El Camino Real, Unit E San Diego, CA 92130 / US | [2008/02] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | Mercer, Christopher Paul Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 06749496.3 | 03.04.2006 | [2008/02] | WO2006US13004 | Priority number, date | US20050668005P | 04.04.2005 Original published format: US 668005 P | [2008/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006108135 | Date: | 12.10.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/41] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1874960 | Date: | 09.01.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.10.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 15.10.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68 | [2008/02] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6806 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
C12Q1/6886 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/106 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/112 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/02] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | LASER-MIKRODISSEKTION UND MIKROARRAY-ANALYSE VON BRUSTTUMOREN ZEIGEN MIT ÖSTROGENREZEPTOR VERBUNDENE GENE UND WEGE | [2008/02] | English: | LASER MICRODISSECTION AND MICROARRAY ANALYSIS OF BREAST TUMORS REVEAL ESTROGEN RECEPTOR RELATED GENES AND PATHWAYS | [2008/02] | French: | MICRODISSECTION AU LASER ET ANALYSE PAR JEU ORDONNÉ DE MICRO-ÉCHANTILLONS DE TUMEURS DU SEIN REVELANT DES GÈNES ET DES VOIES ASSOCIÉS AU RÉCEPTEUR D'OESTROGÈNE | [2008/02] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2007 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2007 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2007 | Examination requested [2008/02] | 03.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/17] | 08.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |