EP2030400 - METHOD AND APPARATUSES FOR ESTABLISHING A SECURE CHANNEL BETWEEN A USER TERMINAL AND A SIP SERVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget LM Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/21] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L M Ericsson (publ) 164 83 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2009/10] | For all designated states Telefonaktiebolaget L.M. Ericsson 164 83 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HALLENSTÅL, Magnus Täbyvägen 220 S-187 50 Tåby / SE | 02 /
CAGENIUS, Torbjörn Stackvägen 16b S-191 34 Sollentuna / SE | 03 /
FASBENDER, Andreas Maastrichter Strasse 69 52074 Aachen / DE | [2009/10] | Representative(s) | Ericsson Patent Development Torshamnsgatan 21-23 164 80 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/28] | Barrett, Peter Andrew John, et al Ericsson Limited Patent Unit Optical Networks Unit 4 Midleton Gate Guildford Business Park Guildford, Surrey GU2 8SG / GB | ||
Former [2009/10] | Lind, Robert Marks & Clerk 4220 Nash Court Oxford Business Park South Oxford OX4 2RU / GB | Application number, filing date | 06755191.1 | 15.05.2006 | [2009/10] | WO2006EP62314 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007131548 | Date: | 22.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2030400 | Date: | 04.03.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.11.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2030400 | Date: | 23.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.11.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L29/08 | [2015/17] | CPC: |
H04L63/0428 (EP,US);
H04L63/062 (EP,US);
H04L65/1016 (EP,US);
H04L67/14 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/10] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/39] |
Former [2009/10] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUM AUFBAU EINES GESICHERTEN KANALS ZWISCHEN EINEM ENDGERÄT UND EINEM SIP-SERVER | [2015/17] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUSES FOR ESTABLISHING A SECURE CHANNEL BETWEEN A USER TERMINAL AND A SIP SERVER | [2009/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREILS POUR ÉTABLIR UN CANAL SÉCURISÉ ENTRE UN TERMINAL UTILISATEUR ET UN SERVEUR SIP | [2015/17] |
Former [2009/10] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SICHEREN KANALS ZWISCHEN EINEM BENUTZERTERMINAL UND EINEM SIP-SERVER | ||
Former [2009/10] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREILS PERMETTANT D'ÉTABLIR UN CANAL SÉCURISÉ ENTRE UN TERMINAL UTILISATEUR ET UN SERVEUR SIP | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2008 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/10] | 06.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 24.06.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.05.2006 | AT | 23.09.2015 | BE | 23.09.2015 | BG | 23.09.2015 | CY | 23.09.2015 | CZ | 23.09.2015 | DK | 23.09.2015 | EE | 23.09.2015 | ES | 23.09.2015 | FI | 23.09.2015 | IT | 23.09.2015 | LT | 23.09.2015 | LV | 23.09.2015 | MC | 23.09.2015 | NL | 23.09.2015 | PL | 23.09.2015 | RO | 23.09.2015 | SE | 23.09.2015 | SI | 23.09.2015 | SK | 23.09.2015 | TR | 23.09.2015 | GR | 24.12.2015 | IS | 23.01.2016 | PT | 25.01.2016 | IE | 15.05.2016 | LU | 15.05.2016 | CH | 31.05.2016 | FR | 31.05.2016 | LI | 31.05.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 15.05.2006 | |
AT | 23.09.2015 | ||
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
TR | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
IE | 15.05.2016 | ||
LU | 15.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 15.05.2006 | |
AT | 23.09.2015 | ||
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
CY | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
MC | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
IE | 15.05.2016 | ||
LU | 15.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/26] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
IE | 15.05.2016 | ||
LU | 15.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
FR | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 15.05.2016 | ||
CH | 31.05.2016 | ||
LI | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
LU | 15.05.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
BE | 23.09.2015 | ||
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SI | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
DK | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 23.09.2015 | |
CZ | 23.09.2015 | ||
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
PL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
PT | 25.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
RO | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
SK | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CZ | 23.09.2015 | |
EE | 23.09.2015 | ||
ES | 23.09.2015 | ||
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
IS | 23.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 23.09.2015 | |
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
IT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 23.09.2015 | |
FI | 23.09.2015 | ||
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/14] | FI | 23.09.2015 | |
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
NL | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | FI | 23.09.2015 | |
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
SE | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 23.09.2015 | |
LT | 23.09.2015 | ||
LV | 23.09.2015 | ||
GR | 24.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 23.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2005039141 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-14 * page 1, line 10 - page 11, line 37; figures 1,3,4 *; | [A] - "Digital cellular telecommunications system (Phase 2+); Universal Mobile Telecommunications System (UMTS); 3G security; Access security for IP-based services (3GPP TS 33.203 version 7.0.0 Release 7); ETSI TS 133 203", ETSI STANDARDS, EUROPEAN TELECOMMUNICATIONS STANDARDS INSTITUTE, SOPHIA-ANTIPO, FR, (200512), vol. 3-SA3, no. V700, ISSN 0000-0001, pages 1 - 48, XP014032871 [A] 1-14 * paragraph [5.1.3.] * * paragraph [6.2.] * * paragraph [ANNEX.I] * * paragraph [ANNEX.J] * * paragraph [ANNEX.L] * | [A] - JENNINGS CISCO SYSTEMS J PETERSON NEUSTAR C ET AL, "Private Extensions to the Session Initiation Protocol (SIP) for Asserted Identity within Trusted Networks", IETF STANDARD, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (200211), ISSN 0000-0003, pages 1 - 18, XP015009093 [A] 1-14 * paragraph [005.] * * paragraph [9.1.] * | [A] - STEVEN WHITEHEAD VERIZON MARIE-JOSE MONTPETIT MOTOROLA CONNECTED HOME SOLUTIONS XAVIER MARJOU FRANCE TELECOM, "An Evaluation of Session Initiation Protocol (SIP) for use in Streaming Media Applications 00.txt", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (200602), ISSN 0000-0004, pages 1 - 17, XP015044710 [A] 1-14 * paragraph [001.] - paragraph [3.1.] * * paragraph [010.] * |