EP1889475 - AUTOMATIC DOOR MECHANISM FOR PROJECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.04.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.05.2013 [2013/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-dong Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-875 / KR | [2012/25] |
Former [2008/08] | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yoido-dong, Youngdungpo-gu Seoul 150-875 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOO, Seung hon 620-1, Yeoksam 1(il)-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-908 / KR | [2012/03] |
Former [2008/08] | 01 /
YOO, Seung hon 620-1 Yeoksam 1(il)-dong, Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-908 / KR | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/08] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06757655.3 | 04.05.2006 | [2008/08] | WO2006KR01707 | Priority number, date | KR20050043428 | 24.05.2005 Original published format: KR 20050043428 | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006126789 | Date: | 30.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1889475 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1889475 | Date: | 20.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 30.11.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/74, G03B21/16, H05K7/20 | [2010/40] | CPC: |
H04N9/3144 (EP,US);
H04N5/74 (KR);
G03B21/16 (EP,US);
H04N9/3141 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/08] | H04N5/74 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2008/28] |
Former [2008/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHER TÜRMECHANISMUS FÜR EINEN PROJEKTOR | [2008/08] | English: | AUTOMATIC DOOR MECHANISM FOR PROJECTOR | [2008/08] | French: | MECANISME DE PORTE AUTOMATIQUE POUR PROJECTEUR | [2008/08] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 19.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 25.12.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.03.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.05.2011 | Opposition(s) | 21.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 20.06.2012 | [2013/15] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]KR19990048050 (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CORP [KR]) [Y] 5-8,16,17,22,23,25 * abstract *; | [XY]JP2002244213 (SEIKO EPSON CORP) [X] 1-4,10,18-21 * paragraphs [0001] , [0 50] , [0051] * * paragraphs [0057] - [0064]; figures 3,11,12 * [Y] 5-8,16,17,22,23,25; | [A]KR20050047624 (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CORP [KR]) [A] 1-25* the whole document * | International search | [Y]JP2002244213 (SEIKO EPSON CORP); | [Y]KR19990048050 ; | [A]KR20050047624 (DAEWOO ELECTRONICS CORP [KR]); | [A]JP2005092098 (HITACHI LTD) |