EP1889169 - MOBILE DEVICE ADDRESS BOOK BUILDER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.11.2012 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.12.2012 [2012/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fusionone Inc. 1 Almaden Boulevard, 11th Floor San Jose, CA 95113 / US | [2008/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ONYON, Richard 1727 Shasta Avenue San Jose, CA 95128 / US | 02 /
STANNARD, Liam 1727 Shasta Avenue San Jose, CA 95128 / US | 03 /
RIDGARD, Leighton 1727 Shasta Avenue San Jose, CA 95128 / US | [2008/08] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | Goddar, Heinz J. FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06760224.3 | 19.05.2006 | [2008/08] | WO2006US19571 | Priority number, date | US20050682883P | 19.05.2005 Original published format: US 682883 P | [2008/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006125183 | Date: | 23.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1889169 | Date: | 20.02.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.05.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/2745, H04M3/493, G06F15/173, // H04M1/57, H04M1/725 | [2011/52] | CPC: |
H04L67/306 (EP,US);
H04L65/1101 (US);
H04M1/2757 (EP,US);
H04M1/72484 (EP,US);
H04M3/42042 (EP,US);
H04L67/04 (EP,US);
H04L67/52 (EP,US);
H04M1/575 (EP,US);
H04M1/72457 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/08] | G06F15/173 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PROGRAMM ZUR ERSTELLUNG EINES MOBILGERÄT-ADRESSBUCHS | [2008/08] | English: | MOBILE DEVICE ADDRESS BOOK BUILDER | [2008/08] | French: | FORMATEUR DU CARNET D'ADRESSES DE DISPOSITIF MOBILE | [2008/08] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2007 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2007 | Search fee paid | 26.10.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2007 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 27.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/52] | 07.08.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2002126814 (AWADA FAISAL M [US], et al) [X] 1-10,12,14,16-27 * paragraph [0017] * * paragraphs [0022] - [0027] * * paragraphs [0037] , [0044] , [0045] * * figures 1-5 * [Y] 11,13 [I] 15; | [Y]WO03056789 (RESEARCH IN MOTION LTD [CA], et al) [Y] 11,13 * paragraphs [0020] - [0021] ** paragraphs [0025] , [0029]; figures 3-5 *; | [XI]US2004146150 (BARNES MICHAELA ANN BEEBY [US]) [X] 1-10,12,14,16-21,23-26 * paragraph [0010] * * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraphs [0033] - [0049]; figures 2,3,4,6,7,8 * [I] 15 | International search | [A]US2004093317 (SWAN JOSEPH G [US]); | [A]US2005021571 (EAST SIMON JEREMY [GB]); | [A]US6868451 (PEACOCK GAVIN [US]); | [X]US2005102328 (RING CAMERON T [US], et al) |