EP1784738 - BACKPLANE FOR USE IN A RACK FOR PERIPHERAL DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.11.2009 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fujitsu Siemens Computers GmbH Domagkstrasse 28 80807 München / DE | [2007/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NEHLING, Kornelius Flensburger Str. 21 33605 Bielefeld / DE | 02 /
DEPTA, Robert Olympiastrasse 6 86179 Augsburg / DE | [2007/20] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schlossschmidstrasse 5 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/20] | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Ridlerstrasse 55 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06761760.5 | 04.07.2006 | [2007/20] | WO2006DE01158 | Priority number, date | DE20051033004 | 14.07.2005 Original published format: DE102005033004 | [2007/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007006267 | Date: | 18.01.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1784738 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1784738 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.01.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/40 | [2007/20] | CPC: |
G06F13/4063 (EP,US);
H05K7/1455 (EP,US);
H05K7/1458 (EP,US);
Y10S439/955 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/35] |
Former [2007/20] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STECKERPLATINE ZUM EINSATZ IN EINEM EINSCHUBRAHMEN FÜR PERIPHERIEGERÄTE | [2007/20] | English: | BACKPLANE FOR USE IN A RACK FOR PERIPHERAL DEVICES | [2007/20] | French: | PLAQUE ENFICHABLE DESTINEE A ETRE UTILISEE DANS DES RACKS POUR APPAREILS PERIPHERIQUES | [2007/20] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/20] | 25.07.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.11.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.10.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/53] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2003227728 (CHANG TING-YU [TW], et al) [X] 1-3,9,13,14 * paragraph [0042] * * figures 1,3 * [A] 4-8,10-12; | [A] - KEVIN GRAY, Serial Attached SCSI: A Serial Interface for Enterprise Storage Systems, MAXTOR CORPORATION, (20030731), XP002407997 [A] 1-14 * page 2 * |