|
27.02.2018 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.02.2018 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.02.2018 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.02.2018 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.02.2018 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
03.11.2017 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2017 |
Request for change of client data cannot be registered anymore |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2017 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.09.2016 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (non-payment of renewal fee) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
26.11.2015 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.11.2015 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.11.2015 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.09.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.09.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.09.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.09.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
22.09.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.09.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2015 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
21.09.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2015 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.09.2015 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.07.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2015 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
7 |
|
06.07.2015 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.06.2015 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
3 |
|
11.06.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.06.2015 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.06.2015 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
75 |
|
09.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
31.03.2015 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.03.2015 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2015 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
25 |
|
28.10.2014 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.10.2014 |
F3203 Composition of the Board (J) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2014 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
25.09.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
26 |
|
08.09.2014 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
26 |
|
03.09.2014 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.09.2014 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.08.2014 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2014 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2014 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.07.2014 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
28.04.2014 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
17.12.2013 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.11.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.11.2013 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
59 |
|
28.10.2013 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
08.07.2013 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
08.07.2013 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.07.2012 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
365 |
|
14.05.2012 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.02.2012 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2012 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.02.2012 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.02.2012 |
Brief communication to third party |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2012 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.02.2012 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.02.2012 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
10.01.2012 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.12.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2011 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2011 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2011 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.12.2011 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.12.2011 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.11.2011 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
18.11.2011 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
17.11.2011 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
27 |
|
10.11.2011 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2011 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Brief communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2011 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2011 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.08.2011 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
102 |
|
31.01.2011 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2010 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2010 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.06.2010 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
23.06.2010 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
05.05.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2009 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.12.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.12.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
29.12.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.12.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
29.12.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
06.11.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.09.2008 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.06.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.03.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.02.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
19.12.2007 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.03.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
06.03.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
10.11.2006 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
4 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
24 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
14 |