|
12.04.2021 |
Communication concerning a request to change bibliographic data after the decision to grant/decision to maintain the patent in a |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.01.2021 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.12.2020 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.10.2020 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.10.2020 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2020 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2020 |
English translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.10.2020 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
14.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.09.2020 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
4 |
|
17.09.2020 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.09.2020 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.03.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2020 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
05.03.2020 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2020 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
47 |
|
05.03.2020 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
17 |
|
05.03.2020 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.03.2020 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2020 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2020 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.03.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.03.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2020 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2020 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2020 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.03.2020 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.01.2020 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.10.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.10.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.10.2019 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.05.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.05.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.05.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.05.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
15.05.2019 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.05.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.05.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.01.2019 |
Claims |
Opposition |
6 |
|
10.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2019 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.01.2019 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
8 |
|
31.08.2018 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
31.08.2018 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.08.2018 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2018 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
30.05.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.05.2018 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2018 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.05.2018 |
F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.04.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Description |
Appeal |
28 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.04.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
02.03.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.02.2018 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.02.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2018 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.11.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.11.2017 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.11.2017 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
03.11.2017 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2017 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2017 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2016 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.11.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2015 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2015 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2015 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2015 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.05.2015 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2015 |
Communication of amended entries in the Register of European Patents |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.04.2015 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.04.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.04.2013 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.03.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2013 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
01.02.2013 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.01.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.01.2013 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.2013 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.09.2012 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
10.09.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.09.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
10.09.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
26 |
|
21.08.2012 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.2012 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
24.07.2012 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2012 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.07.2012 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
11.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
20 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.05.2012 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.04.2012 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
26.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2012 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.03.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
19.03.2012 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.03.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
19.03.2012 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.03.2012 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2012 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
26.01.2012 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.01.2012 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2012 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.05.2011 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.03.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.02.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2011 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
01.02.2011 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2011 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2010 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.11.2010 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2010 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2010 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.06.2010 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.06.2010 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
19 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
31 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
26.05.2010 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
03.02.2010 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.07.2009 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2009 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2009 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.06.2009 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.06.2009 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
27.05.2009 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.05.2009 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.05.2009 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
26.02.2009 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.02.2009 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.02.2009 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.02.2009 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
31.10.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
31.10.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
31.10.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.06.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.04.2008 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.03.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.02.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.02.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
14.11.2007 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
10.08.2007 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
14.02.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
25.01.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.01.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
25.01.2007 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
23.08.2006 |
Request for correction of obvious error |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
7 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
32 |
|
21.07.2006 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
16 |