EP1902375 - A MALIGNANT BOT CONFRONTATION METHOD AND ITS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.04.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KT Corporation 206, Jeongja-dong Bundang-gu Sungnam-si Gyeonggi-do 463-010 / KR | [2008/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OH, Seung Tak IPR Team Future- Technology Laboratory KT Corporation 17 Woomyeaon-dong, Seocho-gu Seoul 137-792 / KR | 02 /
JEONG, Ju Hwan IPR Team Future- Technology Laboratory KT Corporation 17 Woomyeaon-dong, Seocho-gu Seoul 137-792 / KR | 03 /
HAN, Gyu Kweon IPR Team Future- Technology Laboratory KT Corporation 17 Woomyeaon-dong, Seocho-gu Seoul 137-792 / KR | 04 /
LEE, Sang Youb IPR Team Future- Technology Laboratory KT Corporation 17 Woomyeaon-dong, Seocho-gu Seoul 137-792 / KR | 05 /
OH, Se Man KT Hehwa Branch Office Yeongun-dong Jongro-gu Seoul 110-763 / KR | 06 /
KWON, Young Kwan IPR Team Future- Technology Laboratory KT Corporation 17 Woomyeaon-dong, Seocho-gu Seoul 137-792 / KR | [2017/29] |
Former [2008/35] | 01 /
OH, Seung Tak IPR Team Future- Technology Laboratory KT Corporation 17 Woomyeaon-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-792 / KR | ||
02 /
JEONG, Ju Hwan IPR Team Future- Technology Laboratory KT Corporation 17 Woomyeaon-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-792 / KR | |||
03 /
HAN, Gyu Kweon IPR Team Future- Technology Laboratory KT Corporation 17 Woomyeaon-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-792 / KR | |||
04 /
LEE, Sang Youb IPR Team Future- Technology Laboratory KT Corporation 17 Woomyeaon-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-792 / KR | |||
05 /
OH, Se Man KT Hehwa Branch Office Yeongun-dong Jongro-gu Seoul 110-763 / KR | |||
06 /
KWON, Young Kwan IPR Team Future- Technology Laboratory KT Corporation 17 Woomyeaon-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-792 / KR | |||
Former [2008/30] | 01 /
OH, Seung Tak IPR Team Future- Technology Laboratory KT Corporation 17 Woomyeaon-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-792 / KR | ||
02 /
JEONG, Ju Hwan IPR Team Future- Technology Laboratory KT Corporation 17 Woomyeaon-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-792 / KR | |||
03 /
HAN, Gyu Kweon IPR Team Future- Technology Laboratory KT Corporation 17 Woomyeaon-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-792 / KR | |||
04 /
LEE, Sang Youb IPR Team Future- Technology Laboratory KT Corporation 17 Woomyeaon-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-792 / KR | |||
05 /
OH, Se Man IPR Team Future- Technology Laboratory KT Corporation 17 Woomyeaon-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-792 / KR | |||
06 /
KWON, Young Kwan IPR Team Future- Technology Laboratory KT Corporation 17 Woomyeaon-dong Seocho-gu Seoul 137-792 / KR | |||
Former [2008/13] | 01 /
OH, Seung Tak Korea Telecommunication R&D Center Umyeon-dong, Seocho-gu Seoul 137-792 / KR | ||
02 /
JEONG, Ju Hwan KT Hehwa Branch Office Yeongun-dong, Jongro-gu Seoul 110-763 / KR | |||
03 /
HAN, Gyu Kweon KT Hehwa Branch Office Yeongun-dong, Jongro-gu Seoul 110-763 / KR | |||
04 /
LEE, Sang Youb KT Hehwa Branch Office Yeongun-dong, Jongro-gu Seoul 110-763 / KR | |||
05 /
OH, Se Man KT Hehwa Branch Office Yeongun-dong, Jongro-gu Seoul 110-763 / KR | |||
06 /
KWON, Young Kwan KT Hehwa Branch Office Yeongun-dong, Jongro-gu Seoul 110-763 / KR | Representative(s) | Beck Greener LLP Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/16] | Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2013/20] | Freeman, Avi Beck Greener Fulwood House 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | ||
Former [2008/13] | Needle, Jacqueline Beck Greener Fulwood House, 12 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HR / GB | Application number, filing date | 06769087.5 | 28.06.2006 | [2008/13] | WO2006KR02512 | Priority number, date | KR20050061559 | 08.07.2005 Original published format: KR 20050061559 | [2008/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007007960 | Date: | 18.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1902375 | Date: | 26.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1902375 | Date: | 19.07.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.01.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/12, H04L29/06 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
H04L63/1416 (EP,US);
G06F17/00 (KR);
G06F15/00 (KR);
H04L61/4511 (EP,US);
H04L63/1491 (EP,US);
H04L2463/144 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/13] | G06F15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/29] |
Former [2008/13] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR KONFRONTATION BÖSWILLIGER BOTS UND SYSTEM DAFÜR | [2008/13] | English: | A MALIGNANT BOT CONFRONTATION METHOD AND ITS SYSTEM | [2008/13] | French: | PROCEDE DE CONFRONTATION DE DEBUT DE BANDE BOT MALVEILLANTE ET SYSTEME CORRESPONDANT | [2008/13] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 24.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 10.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.11.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.11.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.07.2009 | Opposition(s) | 20.04.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 28.06.2006 | AT | 19.07.2017 | CY | 19.07.2017 | CZ | 19.07.2017 | DK | 19.07.2017 | EE | 19.07.2017 | ES | 19.07.2017 | FI | 19.07.2017 | IT | 19.07.2017 | LT | 19.07.2017 | LV | 19.07.2017 | MC | 19.07.2017 | NL | 19.07.2017 | PL | 19.07.2017 | PT | 19.07.2017 | RO | 19.07.2017 | SE | 19.07.2017 | SI | 19.07.2017 | SK | 19.07.2017 | TR | 19.07.2017 | BG | 19.10.2017 | GR | 20.10.2017 | IS | 19.11.2017 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 28.06.2006 | |
AT | 19.07.2017 | ||
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PT | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
TR | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
TR | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
MC | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SI | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
IT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
EE | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
RO | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
SK | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
CZ | 19.07.2017 | ||
DK | 19.07.2017 | ||
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
LV | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
ES | 19.07.2017 | ||
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
PL | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
BG | 19.10.2017 | ||
GR | 20.10.2017 | ||
IS | 19.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 19.07.2017 | |
FI | 19.07.2017 | ||
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 19.07.2017 | |
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
SE | 19.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 19.07.2017 | |
LT | 19.07.2017 | ||
NL | 19.07.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 19.07.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0223805 (KARAKORAM LTD [CY], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 9, line 20 - page 10, line 4 * * page 12, line 4 - line 25 * * page 30, line 27 - page 31, line 35 * * page 35, line 13 - line 22 * * page 45, line 14 - line 20 *; | [X]US2002184528 (SHEVENELL MICHAEL P [US], et al) [X] 1-9 * figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0035] * * paragraph [0040] *; | [X] - MIYOUNG KIM ET AL, "Design and Implementation of the HoneyPot System with Focusing on the Session Redirection", COMPUTATIONAL SCIENCE AND ITS APPLICATIONS Â ICCSA 2004; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS], SPRINGER-VERLAG, BERLIN/HEIDELBERG, (20040423), vol. 3043, ISBN 978-3-540-22054-1, pages 262 - 269, XP019006767 [X] 1-9 * page 262, section 1, paragraph 1 - page 263, section 2.1, paragraph 1 * * page 267, section 4, paragraph 1 - page 268, paragraph 1 * * page 268; figure 3 * | International search | [A]US5898830 (WESINGER JR RALPH E [US], et al); | [A]US6269392 (COTICHINI CHRISTIAN [CA], et al); | [A]US6300863 (COTICHINI CHRISTIAN [CA], et al); | [A]JP2004072453 (CABLE & WIRELESS IDC INC) | by applicant | US2002184528 |