EP1899908 - EMBEDDED MODULE FOR REAL-TIME RISK ANALYSIS AND TREATMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 03.02.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 07.03.2012 [2012/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAP Governance Risk and Compliance, Inc 47257 Fremont Boulevard Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [2008/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAPLETON, Susan 5871 Crystal Park Circle St. Louis, MO 63128 / US | 02 /
KAKKERA, Srinivasa 39896 Potrero Drive Newark, CA 94560 / US | [2008/12] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/12] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06770915.4 | 22.05.2006 | [2008/12] | WO2006US19862 | Priority number, date | US20050683928P | 23.05.2005 Original published format: US 683928 P | [2008/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2006127676 | Date: | 30.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1899908 | Date: | 19.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.11.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q99/00 | [2008/12] | CPC: |
G06F21/604 (EP,US);
G06Q10/00 (EP,US);
G06Q30/018 (EP,US);
H04L63/08 (EP,US);
H04L63/102 (EP,US);
Y04S40/20 (EP);
Y10T156/1028 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINGEBETTETES MODUL ZUR ECHTZEIT-RISIKOANALYSE UND -BEHANDLUNG | [2008/12] | English: | EMBEDDED MODULE FOR REAL-TIME RISK ANALYSIS AND TREATMENT | [2008/12] | French: | MODULE INTEGRE POUR L'ANALYSE ET LE TRAITEMENT DU RISQUE EN TEMPS REEL | [2008/12] | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2007 | Search fee paid | 13.12.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.03.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 13.12.2007 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 17.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.10.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2012/10] | 28.10.2011 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2012/10] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US2003084053 (GOVRIN DAVID [IL], et al); | [A]US2004015857 (CORNELIUS SHAWN S [US], et al); | [Y]US2004177360 (BEISIEGEL MICHAEL [US], et al); | [A]US6856942 (GARNETT KATRINA [US], et al); | [A]US2005040223 (YIGIT AHMET [US], et al) |