|
04.07.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2014 |
Confirmation of revocation of automatic debit order |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.02.2014 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2013 |
Refund of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2013 |
Communication from the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2013 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
28.05.2013 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
12.04.2013 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
12.04.2013 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.04.2013 |
Letter to the Legal Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.04.2013 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.04.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Text: Decision / Communication |
Appeal |
16 |
|
25.03.2013 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.03.2013 |
F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
22.02.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2013 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.02.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
26 |
|
14.02.2013 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's name |
Appeal |
26 |
|
08.02.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2013 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Appeal |
14 |
|
06.12.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.11.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.11.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.11.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.11.2012 |
Request for change of representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.11.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.10.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.10.2012 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
8 |
|
26.10.2012 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.09.2012 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.02.2012 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2010 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.01.2010 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
10.11.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
06.11.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
03.11.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
24.08.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.07.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the applicant/patent proprietor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.07.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.07.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2009 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.06.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2009 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.06.2009 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.06.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.06.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.06.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.05.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.05.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.05.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.01.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.01.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2009 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2009 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Invitation to file priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.11.2008 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.11.2008 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.08.2008 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2008 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2008 |
Priority document not received from IB during Euro-PCT phase |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2008 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.02.2008 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.02.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.01.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Notice on debiting of fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.11.2007 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.10.2007 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.01.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
43 |
|
04.01.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.01.2007 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
32 |