EP1860873 - METHOD, SYSTEM AND RECEIVING TERMINAL FOR BROADCASTING CONTENTS IN DIGITAL BROADCAST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/48] | MOTHOD, SYSTEM AND RECEIVING TERMINAL FOR BROADCASTING CONTENTS IN DIGITAL BROADCAST | ||
[2010/07] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.02.2011 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2007/52] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | ||
Former [2007/48] | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co Ltd Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen 518129 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Zhibin Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Disrict Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Shengqiong Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2007/48] | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 11a 80339 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/48] | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner GbR Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Theresienhöhe 13 80339 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 06775479.6 | 24.08.2006 | [2007/48] | WO2006CN02161 | Priority number, date | CN2005196915 | 24.08.2005 Original published format: CN200510096915 | [2007/48] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007022725 | Date: | 01.03.2007 | Language: | ZH | [2007/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1860873 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1860873 | Date: | 14.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.03.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/44 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
H04N5/50 (EP,US);
H04N21/4335 (KR);
H04H60/72 (EP,US);
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N21/426 (EP,US);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N21/4532 (EP,US);
H04N21/458 (EP,US);
H04N21/4583 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/48] | Extension states | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN, SYSTEM UND EMPFANGSENDGERÄT ZUR UBERTRAGUNG VON INHALTEN BEI DIGITALEM RUNDFUNK | [2007/48] | English: | METHOD, SYSTEM AND RECEIVING TERMINAL FOR BROADCASTING CONTENTS IN DIGITAL BROADCAST | [2010/07] | French: | PROCEDE, SYSTEME ET TERMINAL DE RECEPTION POUR CONTENUS DE RADIODIFFUSION DANS UNE RADIODIFFUSION NUMERIQUE | [2007/48] |
Former [2007/48] | MOTHOD, SYSTEM AND RECEIVING TERMINAL FOR BROADCASTING CONTENTS IN DIGITAL BROADCAST | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2007 | Translation filed | 14.09.2007 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2007 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 11.09.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.01.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 25.02.2010 | 29.01.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.02.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 01.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 01.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.04.2010 | BE | 14.04.2010 | CZ | 14.04.2010 | DK | 14.04.2010 | EE | 14.04.2010 | IT | 14.04.2010 | LT | 14.04.2010 | LV | 14.04.2010 | NL | 14.04.2010 | PL | 14.04.2010 | RO | 14.04.2010 | SI | 14.04.2010 | SK | 14.04.2010 | TR | 14.04.2010 | CY | 19.05.2010 | BG | 14.07.2010 | GR | 15.07.2010 | ES | 25.07.2010 | IS | 14.08.2010 | PT | 16.08.2010 | IE | 24.08.2010 | LU | 24.08.2010 | CH | 31.08.2010 | LI | 31.08.2010 | MC | 31.08.2010 | HU | 15.10.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2012/47] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
BG | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
TR | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
IE | 24.08.2010 | ||
LU | 24.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
HU | 15.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
BG | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
IE | 24.08.2010 | ||
LU | 24.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
HU | 15.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
BG | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
IE | 24.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
HU | 15.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
BG | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
IE | 24.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
IE | 24.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/20] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
CH | 31.08.2010 | ||
LI | 31.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/18] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
BE | 14.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 14.04.2010 | ||
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
IT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
RO | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
SK | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
MC | 31.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/09] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
DK | 14.04.2010 | ||
EE | 14.04.2010 | ||
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
PT | 16.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/05] | AT | 14.04.2010 | |
LT | 14.04.2010 | ||
LV | 14.04.2010 | ||
NL | 14.04.2010 | ||
PL | 14.04.2010 | ||
SI | 14.04.2010 | ||
CY | 19.05.2010 | ||
GR | 15.07.2010 | ||
ES | 25.07.2010 | ||
IS | 14.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 14.04.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO0052621 (VUETOPIA INC [US]) [X] 1-12* page 10, lines 5-11;; figure 1 *; | [X]US6389593 (YAMAGISHI YASUAKI [JP]) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0073] - paragraph [0079]; figure 2 *; | [X]WO02054768 (SONG DEYANG [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * figure 1; claim 26 *; | [X]WO03038674 (IBIQUITY DIGITAL CORP [US]) [X] 1-12 * Page 16, line 18-page 17, line 10) and table 2 in fig. 9;; figures 1,9 *; | [X]US2004194131 (ELLIS MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * paragraph [0130] - paragraph [0137]; figures 1,18b * | International search | [X]CN1394436 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]); | [X]CN1565120 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]); | [X]CN1602626 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) |