EP1919958 - SYSTEM FOR SCREENING CELLS FOR HIGH EXPRESSION OF A PROTEIN OF INTEREST (POI) [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Serono SA Centre Industriel 1267 Coinsins, Vaud / CH | [2009/25] |
Former [2008/20] | For all designated states Laboratoires Serono SA Centre Industriel 1267 Coinsins, Vaud / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUPRAZ, Philippe 25, chemin du Ferrage CH-1023 Crissier / CH | 02 /
KOBR, Michel 6A, route de Bremblens CH-1026 Echandens / CH | [2008/20] | Representative(s) | Merck Serono S.A. Intellectual Property Zone Industrielle de l'Ouriettaz 1170 Aubonne / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/20] | Merck Serono International S.A. Intellectual Property Intellectual Property Department 9, chemin des Mines 1202 Geneva / CH | Application number, filing date | 06778357.1 | 25.08.2006 | [2008/20] | WO2006EP65682 | Priority number, date | EP20050018634 | 26.08.2005 Original published format: EP 05018634 | US20050714500P | 06.09.2005 Original published format: US 714500 P | [2008/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007023184 | Date: | 01.03.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1919958 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.03.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.03.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C07K19/00, C12N15/62, C12N5/10, C12N15/63, G01N33/50 | [2008/20] | CPC: |
C12N9/1205 (EP,US);
C12N15/64 (EP,US);
C12N9/1029 (EP,US);
G01N33/5023 (EP,US);
C07K2319/20 (EP,US);
C07K2319/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/20] | Extension states | AL | 01.02.2008 | BA | 01.02.2008 | HR | 01.02.2008 | MK | 01.02.2008 | RS | 01.02.2008 | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUM SCREENING VON ZELLEN FÜR HOHE EXPRESSION EINES PROTEIN OF INTEREST (POI) | [2008/20] | English: | SYSTEM FOR SCREENING CELLS FOR HIGH EXPRESSION OF A PROTEIN OF INTEREST (POI) | [2008/20] | French: | SYSTEME POUR CRIBLER LES CELLULES A LA RECHERCHE DE L'EXPRESSION ELEVEE D'UNE PROTEINE D'INTERET (POI) | [2008/20] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2008 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.02.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/20] | 07.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/33] | 03.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2013 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DX]WO0153325 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US]) [DX] 1-36 * Abstract; claims 13, 14, 17 and 24, 25, 26. *; | [YD]US2004115704 (DALY JOHN [AU]) [YD] 1-36 * Abstract; Ex. 18, Fig. 4b, claim 49. *; | [X]EP1564286 (UNIV LIEGE [BE]) [X] 1* Abstract; example 2, sequence 22. *; | [DY] - GRIFFIN B A ET AL, "Specific Covalent Labeling of Recombinant Protein Molecules Inside Live Cells", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE,, US, (19980710), vol. 281, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 269 - 272, XP002257764 [DY] 1-36 * Abstract; Fig. 1, p. 271, col. 2, paragraph 3. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.281.5374.269 | [DY] - BENNETT R P ET AL, "Fusion of green fluorescent protein with the Zeocin-resistance marker allows visual screening and drug selection of transfected eukaryotic cells", BIOTECHNIQUES, EATON PUBLISHING, NATICK, US, (199803), vol. 24, no. 3, ISSN 0736-6205, pages 478 - 482, XP002114401 [DY] 1-36 * Abstract;Fig. 1. * | Examination | WO2005028615 |