EP2041152 - D-GLUCOPYRANOSE 1-[3,5-BIS(1,1-DIMETHYLETHYL)-4-HYDROXYBENZOATE] COMPOUND AND ITS DERIVATIVES, PREPARATION THEREOF AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RDW Pharma 24 Rue des Reservoirs 78000 Versailles / FR | [2009/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VACHY, Robert 24 rue des Réservoirs F-78000 Versailles / FR | [2009/14] | Representative(s) | Peaucelle, Chantal Cabinet Armengaud Aîné 3, Avenue Bugeaud 75116 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | Peaucelle, Chantal Cabinet Armengaud Aîné 3, Avenue Bugeaud 75116 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/42] | de Saint-Palais, Arnaud Marie Cabinet Moutard 35 Rue de la Paroisse B.P. 20513 78005 Versailles Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2009/14] | de Saint-Palais, Arnaud Marie Cabinet Moutard, 35, rue de la Paroisse 78000 Versailles / FR | Application number, filing date | 06778681.4 | 23.06.2006 | [2009/14] | WO2006FR01486 | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008000920 | Date: | 03.01.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2041152 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.01.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07H13/08, C07C69/76, A61K31/235, A61P31/12 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
C07H13/08 (EP,US);
A61P31/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | D-GLUCOPYRANOSE-1-[3,5-BIS(1,1-DIMETHYLETHYL)-4-HYDROXYBENZOAT]VERBINDUNG UND IHRE DERIVATE, DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN ANWENDUNGEN | [2009/14] | English: | D-GLUCOPYRANOSE 1-[3,5-BIS(1,1-DIMETHYLETHYL)-4-HYDROXYBENZOATE] COMPOUND AND ITS DERIVATIVES, PREPARATION THEREOF AND USES THEREOF | [2009/14] | French: | COMPOSE D-GLUCOPYRANOSE 1-[3,5-BIS(1,1-DIMETHYLETHYL)-4- HYDROXYBENZOATE] ET SES DERIVES, LEUR PREPARATION ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2009/14] | Entry into regional phase | 23.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 23.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 12.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/04] | 08.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2012/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 23.01.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   10.03.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2721924 (FILECO SA [FR]) [A] 1 * page 3, line 18 - page 6, line 9 * * page 6, line 24 - line 25 * * example - * * page 21, line 5 - page 22, line 16 *; | [A]WO9208450 (FILECO SA [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | FR2721924 |