EP1896874 - HIGH FREQUENCY OR MULTIFREQUENCY RESISTIVITY TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.07.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 10200 Bellaire Boulevard Houston, TX 77072 / US | For all designated states Morys, Marian 835 Tremont Drive Downingtown, PA 19335 / US | For all designated states Knizhnik, Sergei 92 Heritage Lane Exton, PA 19341 / US | For all designated states Gallagher, William Francis, III 16 South Forge Manor Drive Phoenixville, PA 19460 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/11] | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 10200 Bellaire Blvd. Houston, TX 77072 / US | ||
For all designated states Morys, Marian 835 Tremont Drive Downingtown, PA 19335 / US | |||
For all designated states Knizhnik, Sergei 92 Heritage Lane Exton, PA 19341 / US | |||
For all designated states Gallagher, William Francis, III 16 South Forge Manor Drive Phoenixville, PA 19460 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORYS, Marian 835 Tremont Drive Downingtown, PA 19335 / US | 02 /
KNIZHNIK, Sergei 92 Heritage Lane Exton, PA 19341 / US | 03 /
GALLAGHER, William, Francis, III 16 South Forge Manor Drive Phoenixville, PA 19460 / US | [2008/11] | Representative(s) | Jennings, Michael John, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | Curtis, Philip Anthony A.A. Thornton & Co. 10 Old Bailey London EC4M 7NG / GB | ||
Former [2008/11] | Curtis, Philip Anthony A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 06785226.9 | 20.06.2006 | [2008/11] | WO2006US24056 | Priority number, date | US20050692301P | 20.06.2005 Original published format: US 692301 P | [2008/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2007002132 | Date: | 04.01.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/01] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1896874 | Date: | 12.03.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1896874 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 26.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01R27/08, G01V3/24 | [2011/43] | CPC: |
G01R27/20 (EP,US);
G01V3/24 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2008/11] | G01V3/00, G01R27/08, G01N27/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/31] |
Former [2008/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | HOCHFREQUENTES ODER MULTIFREQUENTES WIDERSTANDSMESSGERÄT | [2013/26] | English: | HIGH FREQUENCY OR MULTIFREQUENCY RESISTIVITY TOOL | [2008/11] | French: | OUTIL A RESISTIVITE MULTIFREQUENCE OU HAUTE FREQUENCE | [2008/11] |
Former [2008/11] | HOCHFREQUENZ- ODER MULTIFREQUENZRESISTENTES WERKZEUG | Entry into regional phase | 17.01.2008 | National basic fee paid | 17.01.2008 | Search fee paid | 17.01.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.01.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/11] | 21.01.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.02.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.03.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.05.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 14.04.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.11.2012 | Opposition(s) | 28.05.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.08.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2008 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   20.08.2008 | 30.06.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   04.09.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]GB2406650 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US]) [X] 1,4-10,13-17 * page 13, line 9 - page 14, line 12 * * page 15, line 14 - line 16 * * page 17, line 13 - page 18, line 6 * * figures 4,5,7,8 * [I] 2,3,11,12; | [X]US6373254 (DION DOMINIQUE [US], et al) [X] 1,9 * column 1, line 65 - line 67 *; | [A]US2002153897 (EVANS MARTIN TOWNLEY [GB], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US6809521 (TABAROVSKY LEONTY ABRAHAM [US], et al); | [Y]US5235285 (CLARK BRIAN [US], et al) |