blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1915049

EP1915049 - LOW PUNGENCY, LONG DAY ONION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  26.11.2021
Database last updated on 24.07.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  12.02.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.01.2021
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2021Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.12.2021  [2021/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seminis Vegetable Seeds, Inc.
800 North Lindbergh Blvd.
St. Louis MO 63167 / US
[2013/45]
Former [2008/18]For all designated states
Seminis Vegetable Seeds, Inc.
2700 Camino Del Sol
Oxnard, CA 93030 / US
Inventor(s)01 / HENDRICKS, Scott
3073 Saddle Brooke Trail
Sun Prairie, Wisconsin 53590 / US
 [2008/18]
Representative(s)Uexküll & Stolberg
Partnerschaft von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Beselerstraße 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/34]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Former [2008/18]UEXKÜLL & STOLBERG
Patentanwälte Beselerstrasse 4
22607 Hamburg / DE
Application number, filing date06787541.914.07.2006
[2008/18]
WO2006US27647
Priority number, dateUS2005018320215.07.2005         Original published format: US 183202
[2008/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2007011857
Date:25.01.2007
Language:EN
[2007/04]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1915049
Date:30.04.2008
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.01.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2008/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US23.04.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.07.2009
ClassificationIPC:A01H5/06, A01H5/10
[2009/33]
CPC:
A01H6/045 (EP,KR,US); A01H1/02 (KR); A01H1/04 (KR);
A01H4/005 (KR); A01H5/06 (KR)
Former IPC [2008/18]A01H5/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/18]
TitleGerman:MILDE LANGTAGZWIEBEL[2008/18]
English:LOW PUNGENCY, LONG DAY ONION[2008/18]
French:OIGNON DE JOUR LONG FAIBLEMENT PIQUANT[2008/18]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase06.02.2008National basic fee paid 
06.02.2008Search fee paid 
06.02.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
06.02.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
06.02.2008Examination requested  [2008/18]
12.06.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.05.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.12.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2013Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.12.2013
04.12.2013Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
06.08.2015Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.11.2015
12.11.2015Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
28.08.2018Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.09.2018
17.09.2018Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
29.11.2018Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
26.01.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.02.2021Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
16.03.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.07.2021Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2021/52]
24.08.2021Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2021/52]
Appeal following examination30.01.2019Appeal received No.  T0958/19
18.03.2019Statement of grounds filed
09.07.2020Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2020/28]
07.09.2020Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2020/37]
02.10.2020Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
Divisional application(s)EP11186853.5  / EP2412232
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  27.10.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.07.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 04
26.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 05
25.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 06
25.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 07
29.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 08
28.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 09
27.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 10
27.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 11
27.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 12
27.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 13
29.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 14
14.07.2020Renewal fee patent year 15
15.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 16
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]WO9010383  (TEXAS A & M UNIV SYS [US]) [A] 8* the whole document *;
 [XI]  - SCHWIMMER S ET AL, "Enzymatic development of pyruvic acid in onion as a measurement of pungency", AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (1961), vol. 9, no. 4, pages 301 - 304, XP002535116 [X] 1-5,14-15,17-21 * page 302; table 1 * [I] 6-13,16,22-25

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf60116a018
 [XPI]  - CHOPE G A ET AL, "Effect of controlled atmosphere storage on abscisic acid concentration and other biochemical attributes of onion bulbs", POSTHARVEST BIOLOGY AND TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, NL, vol. 39, no. 3, ISSN 0925-5214, (20060301), pages 233 - 242, (20060301), XP025139066 [XP] 1-5,14-15,17-21 * page 235; figure 2 * [I] 8-13,16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.postharvbio.2005.10.010
 [AD]  - Shock C C et al., "Pungency of selected onion varieties before and after storage", Malheur Experiment Station Annual Report 2004, (2004), Malheur Experiment Station, URL: http://www.cropinfo.net/AnnualReports/2004/Onion%20pungency%2004.htm, (20090701), XP002535189 [AD] 1 * the whole document *
 [AD]  - Shock C C et al., "Onion production from transplantations in the treasure valley", Malheur Experiment Station Annual Report 2003, (2003), Malheur Experiment Station, URL: http://www.cropinfo.net/AnnualReports/2003/onivartransp03.html, (20090701), XP002535190 [AD] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  - HAVEY MICHAEL J ET AL, "Combining abilities for yield and bulb quality among long- and intermediate-day open-pollinated onion populations", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR HORTICULTURAL SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 121, no. 4, ISSN 0003-1062, pages 604 - 608, XP008107980 [A] 1,8,22 * the whole document *
International search[X]  - KOPSELL ET AL., HORTSCIENCE, (1997), vol. 32, no. 7, pages 1260 - 1263, XP008107976
ExaminationEP2244554
    - MIKITZEL L ET AL., "Flavour and quality changes in sweet onions during storage at room temperature", JOURNAL OF FOOD QUALITY, (1994), vol. 17, pages 431 - 445
    - LEON A TERRY ET AL, "The application of biosensors to fresh produce and the wider food industry", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, vol. 53, no. 5, doi:10.1021/JF040319T, ISSN 0021-8561, (20050309), pages 1309 - 1316, (20050203), XP002666504

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/JF040319T
    - Expert declaration by Dr. Richard W. Jones
    - Product descriptions of Walla Walla onions
by applicant   - MIKITZEL ET AL., JOURNAL OF FOOD QUALITY, (1994), vol. 17, pages 431 - 445
    - SCHWIMMER, S.; WESTON, W., "Onion Flavor and Odor, Enzymatic Development of Pyruvic Acid in Onions A Measure Of Pungency", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (1961), vol. 9, page 301
    - "Enhancing germplasm with mass selection", BURTON, G.W., Advances in new crops, TIMBER PRESS, (1990), pages 99 - 100
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.