|
06.04.2023 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2023 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2023 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2023 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2023 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.03.2023 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
24.03.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2023 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.01.2023 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
4 |
|
26.01.2023 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
18.01.2023 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2022 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.05.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2022 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.05.2022 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
33 |
|
10.05.2022 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.05.2022 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.05.2022 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.05.2022 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.05.2022 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
45 |
|
10.05.2022 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
45 |
|
21.05.2021 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.05.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.05.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
5 |
|
21.05.2021 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
21.05.2021 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.05.2021 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.03.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.02.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.02.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
25 |
|
26.02.2021 |
Description |
Opposition |
25 |
|
26.02.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.02.2021 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.02.2021 |
Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2021 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2021 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.02.2021 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2021 |
Communication inviting the parties to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2021 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2021 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.01.2021 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.01.2021 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.01.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2021 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2021 |
Withdrawal of a request for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.12.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.12.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.12.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
09.07.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.07.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.07.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
6 |
|
03.07.2020 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2020 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
03.07.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.07.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.03.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.03.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.03.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.2020 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2020 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.02.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.02.2020 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2020 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2020 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.12.2019 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.12.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.12.2019 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.12.2019 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.12.2019 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.11.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.10.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.10.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.10.2019 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.10.2019 |
Consolidated list of cited opposition documents |
Opposition |
2 |
|
06.03.2019 |
F3936 Acknowledgement of receipt Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.03.2019 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.02.2019 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
20 |
|
21.02.2019 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
21.02.2019 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.01.2019 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.01.2019 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.01.2019 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
07.01.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.01.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.01.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.01.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
03.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.2019 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.11.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 017 |
Opposition |
75 |
|
16.11.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 018 |
Opposition |
26 |
|
16.11.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 019 |
Opposition |
17 |
|
16.11.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 020 |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.11.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 021 |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.11.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.11.2018 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
16.11.2018 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
16.11.2018 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
26 |
|
16.11.2018 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
16.11.2018 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
75 |
|
16.11.2018 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
25.10.2018 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
25.10.2018 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
10 |
|
09.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.10.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.10.2018 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.07.2018 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.07.2018 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.2017 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.10.2017 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
6 |
|
27.04.2017 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.02.2017 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.08.2016 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.08.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.08.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Appeal |
3 |
|
19.08.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.08.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.08.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.08.2016 |
Claims |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.08.2016 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
19.08.2016 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
19.08.2016 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.04.2016 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
12.02.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.02.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2016 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.02.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.02.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.02.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
37 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
17 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
30 |
|
27.11.2015 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
19.10.2015 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.09.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 014 |
Opposition |
11 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 015 |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
11 |
|
18.09.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.07.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.05.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.04.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.04.2015 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.03.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.03.2015 |
Submission concerning change of proprietor's address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2015 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
26 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 010 |
Opposition |
20 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 011 |
Opposition |
17 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 012 |
Opposition |
10 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 013 |
Opposition |
8 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Main request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
16.01.2015 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2014 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.11.2014 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.11.2014 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.07.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2014 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2014 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2014 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.06.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.06.2014 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 008 |
Opposition |
28 |
|
04.06.2014 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 009 |
Opposition |
12 |
|
04.06.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
04.06.2014 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
04.09.2013 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2013 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.07.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.07.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2013 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2013 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2013 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.07.2013 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.07.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2013 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
09.07.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2013 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.07.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
08.07.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
63 |
|
26.06.2013 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.06.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
03.06.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.06.2013 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2013 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.05.2013 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2013 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
63 |
|
27.03.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.03.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2013 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.03.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.03.2013 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
26.03.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.03.2013 |
Description |
Search / examination |
18 |
|
26.03.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2013 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2013 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.01.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.01.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.01.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.01.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.01.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.01.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.01.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.01.2013 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
02.01.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.01.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.01.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.01.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.01.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.01.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.01.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.01.2013 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.01.2013 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2013 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
26.10.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.10.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.07.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.07.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2012 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2012 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2012 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.01.2012 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.12.2011 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.12.2011 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.03.2009 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2008 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2008 |
Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2008 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2008 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.04.2008 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2008 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
18.03.2008 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
18.03.2008 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.02.2008 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2008 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.02.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.11.2007 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2007 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
78 |
|
25.01.2007 |
Published international application - A2 |
Opposition |
69 |
|
25.01.2007 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
69 |