EP1947977 - A PACKAGE COMPRISING A REFILL-LOCKING SYSTEM AND A REFILL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/31] | A REFILL-LOCKING SYSTEM, A PACKAGE COMPRISING SAID LOCKING SYSTEM, AND A REFILL | ||
[2014/23] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2016 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Natura Cosméticos S.A. Rodovia Régis Bittencourt, Km 293 Edificio I Potuverá 06882-700 Itapecerica da Serra São Paulo 06882-700 / BR | [2014/50] |
Former [2008/31] | For all designated states Natura Cosméticos S.A. Rua Amador Bueno, 491, Santo Amaro CEP-04752-900 Sao Paulo, SP / BR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARTINS, Paula Renata Rua Hamonia, n 731,apt 34 Vila Madalena Sâo Paulo / BR | 02 /
TOMAS PELLICCIARI, Fabiana Rua Dr. Manoel de Paiva Ramos, 290 ap. 31C São Paulo - SP 05351-015 / BR | 03 /
MARRA, Fernanda Rua BeIa Flor, n 234. Vila Mariana São Paulo / BR | [2015/16] |
Former [2008/48] | 01 /
MARTINS, Paula Renata Rua Hamonia, n 731,apt 34 Vila Madalena Sâo Paulo / BR | ||
02 /
TOMAS PELLICCIARI, Fabiana Rua Dr. Manoel de Paiva Ramos, 290 ap. 31C São Paulo - SP 05351-015 / BR | |||
03 /
MARRA, Fernanda Rua BeIa Flor, n 234. Vila Mariana São Paulo / BR | |||
Former [2008/31] | 01 /
MARTINS, Paula Renata Rua Hamonia, n 731,apt 34 Vila Madalena Sâo Paulo / BR | ||
02 /
TOMAS PELLICCIARI, Fabiana Rua Lenilson Rossi, n 155. Jundial - SP São Paulo / BR | |||
03 /
MARRA, Fernanda Rua BeIa Flor, n 234. Vila Mariana São Paulo / BR | Representative(s) | Burt, Matthew Thomas, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | [2015/16] |
Former [2008/31] | Burt, Matthew Thomas, et al Abel & Imray 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 06790502.6 | 20.10.2006 | [2008/31] | WO2006BR00221 | Priority number, date | BR2005PI04830 | 21.10.2005 Original published format: BR PI0504830 | [2008/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2007045061 | Date: | 26.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1947977 | Date: | 30.07.2008 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2007 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2008/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1947977 | Date: | 15.04.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A45D33/00 | [2008/31] | CPC: |
A45D33/006 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2015/16] |
Former [2008/46] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT | ||
Former [2008/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PACKUNG UMFASSEND EIN NACHFÜLL-VERRIEGELUNGSSYSTEM SOWIE EINE NACHFÜLLUNG | [2014/23] | English: | A PACKAGE COMPRISING A REFILL-LOCKING SYSTEM AND A REFILL | [2014/23] | French: | BOITIER COMPRENANT UNE RECHARGE ET UN SYSTEME DE VERROUILLAGE DE RECHARGE | [2014/23] |
Former [2008/31] | NACHFÜLL-VERRIEGELUNGSSYSTEM, DIESES VERRIEGELUNGSSYSTEM UMFASSENDE PACKUNG UND NACHFÜLLUNG | ||
Former [2008/31] | A REFILL-LOCKING SYSTEM, A PACKAGE COMPRISING SAID LOCKING SYSTEM, AND A REFILL | ||
Former [2008/31] | SYSTEME DE VERROUILLAGE DE RECHARGE, BOITIER COMPRENANT CE SYSTEME DE VERROUILLAGE, ET RECHARGE | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2008 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2007 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 05.05.2008 | Examination requested [2008/31] | 22.05.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.06.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 30.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   11.12.2009 | 31.10.2014 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0733318 (LAFFON DESIGN KREE PLAST SPA [IT]) [X] 1,5-9,11-14 * column 2 - column 3; figure - *; | [X]JP2001314227 (KAMAYA KAGAKU KOGYO CO LTD) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,9,11-14 * abstract *; | [DX]FR2686784 (LOUVRETTE GERD DIETER ERLHOFER [DE]) [DX] 1,5,6,8-14 * page 5 - page 6; figure - *; | DE4203260 [ ] (LOUVRETTE GERD & DIETER ERLHOE [DE]); | [DXA]FR2825593 (LIR FRANCE SA [FR]) [DX] 1,2,4,6,8,9,11-14 * page 4 - page 9; figure - * [A] 3; | [X]JPH08131241 (YOSHIDA KOGYO KK) [X] 1,4,6-9,11-14 * abstract * | by applicant | FR2825593 | DE4203260 | WO2004017788 | US2003213723 | US5931169 | JPH0965920 | EP0733318 |