|
09.12.2021 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
3 |
|
09.12.2021 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
25 |
|
09.12.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.12.2021 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.12.2021 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.08.2021 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2021 |
Refund of fees |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.06.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.06.2021 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2021 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.05.2021 |
F3317 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Proprietor + Opponent) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
29.04.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.04.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.04.2021 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
15.04.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.04.2021 |
Oral proceedings: change of venue |
Appeal |
16 |
|
13.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
13.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.04.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.04.2021 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
01.04.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.04.2021 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
01.04.2021 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
174 |
|
01.04.2021 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
62 |
|
01.04.2021 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
44 |
|
01.04.2021 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
47 |
|
16.02.2021 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
18 |
|
09.06.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.06.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.05.2020 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
26.05.2020 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.05.2020 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.05.2020 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.12.2019 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.11.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
20.11.2019 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
75 |
|
10.07.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2019 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2019 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.07.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2019 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2019 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2019 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
04.07.2019 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
25 |
|
22.02.2019 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2019 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
7 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
35 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
45 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
78 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
34 |
|
18.02.2019 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
7 |
|
21.12.2018 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.12.2018 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.12.2018 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.12.2018 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.12.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.12.2018 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.10.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
6 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
69 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
25 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.10.2018 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
27.08.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
12 |
|
21.08.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.08.2018 |
Amended description with annotations |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.08.2018 |
Clean copy of description pages in the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
21.08.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
21.08.2018 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2018 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.07.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
40 |
|
19.07.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
19.07.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
01.06.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
66 |
|
01.06.2018 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
216 |
|
01.06.2018 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
4 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
13 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
26 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Request for change of opponent's representative |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
6 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.05.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
27 |
|
25.01.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2018 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2018 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.11.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.11.2017 |
Oral proceedings: Request for postponement |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.11.2017 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2017 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.10.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2017 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2017 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
17.10.2017 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.10.2017 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.10.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2017 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.07.2017 |
Miscellaneous requests concerning client data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.06.2017 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
14 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
17 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
159 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
144 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
163 |
|
26.05.2017 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2017 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.01.2017 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.12.2016 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Citation in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
8 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
21 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
265 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
152 |
|
02.12.2016 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
46 |
|
02.03.2016 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.02.2016 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.01.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2016 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.12.2015 |
Information about intention to grant a patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
18.12.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2015 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
95 |
|
20.11.2015 |
Processing of request for correction of text proposed for grant or third party observations (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2015 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.11.2015 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2015 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.11.2015 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2015 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.10.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.10.2015 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2015 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
24.06.2015 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
24.06.2015 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.06.2015 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
95 |
|
27.04.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
102 |
|
27.04.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
58 |
|
27.04.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2015 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.03.2015 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.02.2015 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2014 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.07.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2013 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2013 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2012 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2012 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
37 |
|
15.10.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.10.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
15.10.2012 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
15.10.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.08.2012 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2012 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2012 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.08.2012 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.04.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.04.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2011 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.11.2011 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.09.2011 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.09.2011 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.09.2011 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.09.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.09.2011 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.08.2010 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
30.06.2010 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.01.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.01.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.01.2010 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.01.2010 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.11.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.11.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.11.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.07.2009 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.06.2009 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2009 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.04.2009 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2009 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.03.2009 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
23.03.2009 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.08.2008 |
Non-scannable object |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2008 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2008 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
06.08.2008 |
Reply to the invitation to remedy deficiencies |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.08.2008 |
Sequence listing |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
28.05.2008 |
Deficiencies in sequence listing |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.03.2008 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2008 |
Reply by International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.03.2008 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.03.2008 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.03.2008 |
Enquiry with the International Bureau |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2008 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2008 |
Certificate of deposit of biological material |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2008 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.12.2007 |
Reminder for payment period (examination fee/designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2007 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2007 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2007 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.03.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
159 |
|
15.02.2007 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
163 |
|
25.01.2007 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
145 |